Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Brown, Walter, filed a(n) Slander,Libel,Defamation - Torts case against Murphy, Kathy, Mckendell, Tracy Tilin, Coldwell Banker, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Ioana Petrou presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 19, 2014 |
CategoryDefamation |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions79 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeSlander,Libel,Defamation |
|
Case Cycle Time90 days |
Complaint - Defamation Filed
Date: 2014-08-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Walter Brown
Date: 2014-08-19T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: November 06, 2014Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: October 30, 2014Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2014-08-20T00:00:00Non-Opposition to Motion to Consolidate Filed by Tracy Tilin McKendell
Date: October 27, 2014Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2014-08-19T00:00:00Demurrer to Complaint Filed by Tracy Tilin McKendall
Date: 2014-09-19T00:00:00Non-Opposition to Motion to Demurrer Filed by Tracy Tilin McKendell
Date: October 27, 2014Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed for Tracy Tilin McKendell
Date: November 17, 2014Initial Case Management Conference 01/05/2015 09:15 AM D- 15
Date: 2014-08-20T00:00:00Motion to Consolidate Filed for Defendant
Date: 2014-09-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.