Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Goldstone Management Inc., O'Toole, Jessica, O'Toole, Michael, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against O'Toole, Jessica, O'Toole, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Robert B. Freedman presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management171 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 12, 2014 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
Time To Trial216 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions56 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time821 days |
Demurrer to Complaint Filed by Michael O'Toole
Date: 2014-08-18T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2014-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued
Date: 2014-08-14T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2014-08-22T00:00:00Application Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Evelio Grillo Granted
Date: 2014-09-18T00:00:00Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed
Date: 2014-08-12T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Goldstone Management Inc.
Date: 2014-08-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition demurrer to first amended complaint Filed
Date: 2014-09-17T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2014-08-22T00:00:00Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint Filed by Michael O'Toole
Date: 2014-08-28T00:00:00Application Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Evelio Grillo Filed for Goldstone Management Inc.
Date: 2014-09-08T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2014-11-18T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2014-10-01T00:00:00Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint - Motion Rescheduled
Date: 2014-10-01T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: 2014-11-24T00:00:00Master Jury Trial 11/07/2014 08:45 AM D- 1
Date: 2014-10-16T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed
Date: 2014-11-14T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Michael O'Toole
Date: 2014-10-14T00:00:00Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint - Overruled
Date: 2014-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Recusal/Disqualification as to Brenda Harbin-Forte Filed
Date: 2014-10-01T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2014-10-07T00:00:00Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint - Overruled
Date: 2014-11-18T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: 2014-10-14T00:00:00Answer to Amended Complaint Filed for Jessica O'Toole
Date: 2014-11-24T00:00:00Master Jury Trial Called and Completed
Date: 2014-11-07T00:00:00Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint Filed by Jessica O'Toole
Date: 2014-10-28T00:00:00Hearing Continued to Master Jury Trial dept: 1 date: 01/30/2015 time: 08:45 AM
Date: 2014-12-19T00:00:00Master Jury Trial 12/19/2014 08:45 AM D- 1
Date: 2014-11-25T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Granted
Date: 2015-01-23T00:00:00Master Jury Trial Called and Continued
Date: 2014-12-19T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: 2015-01-22T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Continued
Date: 2015-01-22T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-01-23T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 03/16/2015 09:00 AM D- 24
Date: 2015-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2015-01-26T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: 2015-01-30T00:00:00Opposition (Defts) to Ex Parte to Amend UD Complaint Filed
Date: 2015-01-23T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-01-30T00:00:00Order Vacating Ruling of 1/23/15 and Other Orders Filed
Date: 2015-02-06T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Reservation Set for dept: 24 date: 02/19/2015 time: 03:45 PM
Date: 2015-02-11T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-02-06T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: 2015-02-11T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2015-02-03T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2015-02-06T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-02-11T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed for Michael O'Toole, Jessica O'Toole
Date: 2015-02-13T00:00:00Amended Minutes Amended Minutes of 1/30/2015
Date: 2015-02-09T00:00:00Rejection Letter Issued on Objection
Date: 2015-02-23T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Denied
Date: 2015-02-19T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-03-16T00:00:00Rejection Letter Issued on Objection
Date: 2015-02-20T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-02-19T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2015-03-16T00:00:00Motion Filed by Goldstone Management Inc.
Date: 2015-03-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Jessica O'Toole
Date: 2015-04-30T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-04-21T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2015-05-05T00:00:00Settlement Conference Statement of Michael O'Toole, Jessica O'Toole Filed
Date: 2015-06-23T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: 2015-06-30T00:00:00Motion Granted
Date: 2015-04-21T00:00:00Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-06-25T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Goldstone Management Inc.
Date: 2015-06-23T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2015-04-30T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed for Michael O'Toole, Jessica O'Toole
Date: 2015-04-30T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2015-07-02T00:00:00Motion to Compel Attendance at Deposition Filed for Defendant
Date: 2015-07-15T00:00:00Proof of Service Re; Cross Complaint Filed
Date: 2015-07-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Michael O'Toole, Jessica O'Toole Filed
Date: 2015-07-01T00:00:00Rejection Letter Issued on Proof of Service
Date: 2015-07-01T00:00:00Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Goldstone Management Inc. Filed
Date: 2015-07-09T00:00:00Opposition To Motion to Compel Filed
Date: 2015-07-24T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-07-02T00:00:00Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Goldstone Management Inc. Rejected
Date: 2015-07-17T00:00:00Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Goldstone Management Inc. Filed
Date: 2015-07-10T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-08-06T00:00:00Association of Attorneys Filed
Date: 2015-08-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply to Motion to Compel Filed
Date: 2015-08-04T00:00:00Association of Attorneys Filed
Date: 2015-08-13T00:00:00Application Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for Goldstone Management Inc.
Date: 2015-08-17T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-08-18T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2015-08-20T00:00:00Application Re: Continuance of Trial Date Denied
Date: 2015-08-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine #1 Filed
Date: 2015-08-27T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order Filed for Defendant
Date: 2015-08-27T00:00:00Declaration of Service of its Association of Counsel Filed
Date: 2015-08-24T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-08-27T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2015-08-27T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order - Dropped
Date: 2015-09-01T00:00:00Order to Consolidate Cases Filed
Date: 2015-08-27T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-09-18T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-09-15T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-09-01T00:00:00Rejection Letter Issued on Miscellaneous
Date: 2015-09-01T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order - Dropped
Date: 2015-09-15T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2015-09-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Goldstone Management Inc. Filed
Date: 2016-02-26T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2016-01-11T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Goldstone Management Inc.
Date: 2015-12-03T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-03-18T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2016-03-18T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2016-02-29T00:00:00Motion to Quash Filed
Date: 2016-04-26T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-04-19T00:00:00Motion to Quash Subpoena Filed for Defendant
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Association of Attorneys Filed
Date: 2016-04-19T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: 2016-04-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine #2 Filed
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine #1 Filed
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine Index Filed
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine MIL #1 Filed
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine MIL #2 Filed
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine MIL #6 Filed
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine #3 Filed
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine MIL #4 Filed
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine MIL #5 Filed
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine MIL #3 Filed
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Continue Pretrial Conference Deadlines Filed
Date: 2016-04-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine #4 Filed
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Withdrawal of Attorney Filed for Goldstone Management Inc.
Date: 2016-05-03T00:00:00Miscellaneous Attendance Sheet Filed
Date: 2016-05-04T00:00:00Opposition (Defendant's) to Plaintiffs' MIL No. 4, No. 9 and No. 12 Filed
Date: 2016-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2016-05-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine MIL #8 Filed
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine MIL #11 Filed
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-05-04T00:00:00Motion in Limine MIL #13 Filed
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-05-04T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's) to Defendant MIL #4 Filed
Date: 2016-05-03T00:00:00Association of Attorneys Filed
Date: 2016-05-04T00:00:00Motion in Limine MIL #10 Filed
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine MIL #12 Filed
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine MIL #9 Filed
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Notice of Recusal/Disqualification as to Frank Roesch Filed
Date: 2016-05-04T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's) to Defendant MIL # 2 Filed
Date: 2016-05-03T00:00:00Order at Conclusion of Pretrial Conference Filed
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine MIL #7 Filed
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's) to Defendant Motion in Limine #1 Filed
Date: 2016-05-03T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's) to Defendant MIL # 3 Filed
Date: 2016-05-03T00:00:00Opposition (Defendants') to Plaintiffs' MIL No. 1 Filed
Date: 2016-05-03T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial 05/04/2016 01:30 PM D- 20
Date: 2016-05-04T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous Attendance Sheet Filed
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous Opposition to Motion In Limine 2 Filed
Date: 2016-05-06T00:00:00Declaration of Richard J. Finn is Support of Cross Defendant Goldstone Opposition to Defendant MIL #
Date: 2016-05-03T00:00:00Miscellaneous Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Mil No. 8 Filed
Date: 2016-05-06T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2016-09-15T00:00:00Miscellaneous Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Mil No. 7 Filed
Date: 2016-05-06T00:00:00Miscellaneous Sign-in-Sheet Filed
Date: 2016-05-06T00:00:00Miscellaneous Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Mil No.11 Filed
Date: 2016-05-06T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Motion) Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-06-30T00:00:00Application Re: Order Shortening Time Filed for Michael O'Toole, Jessica O'Toole
Date: 2016-06-29T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2016-06-27T00:00:00Motion to enforce settlment Filed by Michael O'Toole, Jessica O'Toole
Date: 2016-08-01T00:00:00Order Shortening Time Filed
Date: 2016-06-30T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Opposition to Motion to Enforce Settlement Filed
Date: 2016-08-15T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-08-12T00:00:00Motion to Seal Record Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-10-14T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-06-29T00:00:00Judge's Memo to Clerk: Pre-Trial Settlement Conference
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Reply Brief Filed
Date: 2016-08-24T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Motion) - Dropped
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Miscellaneous Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2016-05-06T00:00:00Declaration Re: Order Shortening Time Filed for Goldstone Management Inc.
Date: 2016-10-14T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Opposition to Motion to Enforce Settlement Filed
Date: 2016-08-15T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00Miscellaneous Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Mil No. 3 Filed
Date: 2016-05-06T00:00:00Motion to enforce settlment Granted in Part
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00Miscellaneous Sign-in Sheet Filed
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00Miscellaneous Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Mil No. 6 Filed
Date: 2016-05-06T00:00:00Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-05-06T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00Compliance Hearing 09/16/2016 10:00 AM D- 20
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Miscellaneous Sign-in-Sheet Filed
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment (DEF - John Elrod) Filed
Date: 2016-09-28T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: October 21, 2016Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: November 08, 2016Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: October 21, 2016Motion to Seal Record Granted in Part
Date: October 21, 2016Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: October 21, 2016Declaration Re: Order Shortening Time Granted
Date: October 21, 2016Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: November 10, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.