Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jp Morgan Chase, N.A, Lps Asset Management Solutions, Inc., Wells, William, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Bruce J. Rice Fund, Jp Morgan Chase, N.A, Washington Mutual Bank, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Stephen Kaus presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management139 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 05, 2014 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Tort |
Time To Trial139 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time706 days |
Proof of Service on Complaint As to JP Morgan Chase Filed
Date: 2014-09-02T00:00:00Application Re: Continuance of Hearing Granted
Date: 2015-09-24T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for LPS Asset Management Solutions, Inc.
Date: 2015-12-08T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Filed
Date: June 24, 2016Notice of Errata Filed
Date: 2015-11-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2015-09-23T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2015-11-09T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed for JP Morgan Chase, N.A
Date: 2015-10-01T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: Allowing JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Leave to File Am
Date: 2015-10-23T00:00:00Amended Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Cryprexx Services, LLC
Date: 2015-12-21T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 12/22/2014 03:00 PM D- 514
Date: 2014-08-06T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2014-08-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement of JP Morgan Chase, N.A Filed
Date: 2014-12-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for William Wells
Date: 2014-08-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement of William Wells Filed
Date: 2014-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed for William Wells
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Granted
Date: 2015-09-24T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2014-12-22T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2014-12-22T00:00:00Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed
Date: 2014-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2014-08-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement of LPS Asset Management Solutions, Inc. Filed
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for JP Morgan Chase, N.A
Date: 2014-09-15T00:00:00Proof of Service on Cross-Complaint As to LPS Asset Management Solutions, Inc. Filed
Date: 2015-10-07T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-07-31T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2015-07-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement of JP Morgan Chase, N.A Filed
Date: 2016-02-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement of JP Morgan Chase, N.A Filed
Date: 2015-07-16T00:00:00Application Re: Continuance of Hearing Filed for JP Morgan Chase, N.A
Date: 2015-09-23T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed
Date: 2015-11-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Granted
Date: 2015-10-30T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2015-10-01T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed
Date: June 24, 2016Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 05, 2016Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Cryprexx Services, LLC
Date: 2015-12-14T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Cryprexx Services, LLC
Date: 2016-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2015-12-18T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-09-24T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed for LPS Asset Management Solutions, Inc.
Date: 2015-12-08T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Filed
Date: June 28, 2016Compliance Hearing 07/27/2016 03:00 PM D- 23
Date: 2016-06-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Cryprexx Services, LLC Filed
Date: 2016-02-10T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: 2015-09-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement of William Wells Filed
Date: 2016-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed for William Wells
Date: 2016-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 11, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.