Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jackson, Shawn, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Rhett, Elouise, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Winifred Y. Smith presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2014 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Cycle Time198 days |
Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Granted
Date: 2014-06-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for Elouise Rhett
Date: 2014-04-09T00:00:00Stipulation Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: 2014-05-15T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default as to all un-named tenants/occupants Filed and Entered
Date: 2014-02-28T00:00:00Miscellaneous Request for Continuance Filed
Date: 2014-03-28T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Master Jury Trial 06/27/2014 08:45 AM D- 1
Date: 2014-06-11T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2014-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Service on all un-named tenants/occupants Filed
Date: 2014-02-28T00:00:00Memo To Set Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2014-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued
Date: 2014-01-31T00:00:00Stipulation Re: Other Ex Parte Granted
Date: 2014-05-15T00:00:00Memo to Set - Counter Filed for Defendant
Date: 2014-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Pendency of Action Filed
Date: 2014-05-15T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Master Jury Trial 06/13/2014 08:45 AM D- 1
Date: 2014-05-15T00:00:00Stipulation Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for Elouise Rhett
Date: 2014-06-26T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for Elouise Rhett
Date: July 24, 2014Stipulation Re: Continuance of Trial Date Granted
Date: 2014-06-27T00:00:00Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed
Date: 2014-01-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Shawn Jackson
Date: 2014-01-29T00:00:00Master Jury Trial 04/11/2014 08:45 AM D- 1
Date: 2014-03-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for Elouise Rhett
Date: 2014-04-09T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Master Jury Trial 05/16/2014 08:45 AM D- 1
Date: 2014-04-10T00:00:00Amended Answer to Complaint Filed for Elouise Rhett
Date: 2014-04-09T00:00:00Unlawful Detainer Court Trial 04/03/2014 09:00 AM D- 109
Date: 2014-03-11T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Elouise Rhett
Date: 2014-02-05T00:00:00Hearing Continued to Master Jury Trial dept: 1 date: 08/01/2014 time: 08:45 AM
Date: 2014-06-27T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Master Jury Trial 08/15/2014 08:45 AM D- 1
Date: July 28, 2014Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed
Date: August 14, 2014Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Granted
Date: 2014-04-10T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for Elouise Rhett
Date: 2014-06-11T00:00:00Master Jury Trial Called and Continued
Date: 2014-06-27T00:00:00Order Continuance Filed
Date: July 25, 2014Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: complaint Entered
Date: August 15, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.