Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Whalen, Linda, Whalen, Robert, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case against Anchor Darling Valve Company, Associated Insulation Of California, Boss Manufacturing Company, Fisher Controls International Llc, Flowserve Us, Inc., (total of 17) See All in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Jo-Lynne Q. Lee presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management58 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2014 |
CategoryAsbestos |
Time To Trial107 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions51 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
VerdictPlaintiff |
Case Cycle Time274 days |
Answer to Complaint Filed for The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The
Date: 2014-05-06T00:00:00Amended Answer to Complaint Filed for Metalclad Insulation Corporation
Date: 2014-05-23T00:00:00Notice of Related Case(s) Filed
Date: 2014-05-06T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: 2014-05-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Robert Whalen, Linda Whalen Filed
Date: 2014-05-09T00:00:00Statement of Damages Filed
Date: 2014-05-16T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Gardner-Denver Mining & Construction Divi
Date: 2014-05-08T00:00:00Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Associated Insulation of California Filed
Date: 2014-05-16T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2014-05-16T00:00:00Case Management Conference Filed
Date: 2014-05-23T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2014-05-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference and Mandatory Settlement Conference Dates Filed
Date: 2014-05-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Robert Whalen, Linda Whalen Filed
Date: 2014-07-03T00:00:00Dismissal As to Defendant: Thomas Dee Engineering Company Entered
Date: 2014-07-09T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2014-07-11T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service on Complaint Asbestos As to Goulds Pumps, Inc. Filed
Date: 2014-06-12T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2014-07-08T00:00:00Stipulation And Order Authorizing Electronic Service - Revised Filed
Date: 2014-06-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement of John Crane, Inc. Filed
Date: 2014-06-30T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Thomas Dee Engineering Company Filed
Date: 2014-07-07T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2014-07-11T00:00:00Miscellaneous Designated Defense Counsel Case Management Statement Filed
Date: 2014-07-03T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Metalclad Insulation Corporation Filed
Date: 2014-07-17T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed for FMC Corporation on behalf of its former Northern Pump business
Date: 2014-07-21T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed for Anchor Darling Valve Company
Date: 2014-07-21T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed for Boss Manufacturing Company
Date: 2014-07-31T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Red-White Valve Corp. Filed
Date: 2014-08-01T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed for Flowserve US, Inc.
Date: 2014-08-01T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication Filed by Goulds Pumps, Inc.
Date: 2014-08-01T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed for John Crane, Inc.
Date: 2014-07-31T00:00:00Response Filed
Date: 2014-08-15T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: 2014-08-15T00:00:00Response to John Crane Inc.'s Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2014-08-15T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to MSJ Filed
Date: 2014-08-15T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2014-08-04T00:00:00Miscellaneous Sign in Sheet for Settlement Conference Filed
Date: 2014-08-14T00:00:00Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: 2014-08-14T00:00:00Re-Notice of Of Advancement Of Trial Date & Re-Assignment Of Trial Department And Trial Judge Filed
Date: 2014-08-11T00:00:00Settlement Conference Statement of Anchor Darling Valve Company Lodged
Date: 2014-08-11T00:00:00Proposed Order Filed
Date: 2014-08-15T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to John Crane Inc.'s MSJ Filed
Date: 2014-08-15T00:00:00Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference Filed
Date: 2014-08-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to FMC Corporation on Behalf of Northern Pump Bus
Date: 2014-08-15T00:00:00Objections of Robert Whalen, Linda Whalen Filed
Date: 2014-08-15T00:00:00Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities Supporting Boss Manufacturing MSJ Filed
Date: 2014-08-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous / CMC Statement of Designated Defense Counsel Filed
Date: 2014-08-22T00:00:00Response to Plaintiffs' Evidentiary Objections to its MSJ Filed
Date: 2014-08-22T00:00:00Order on Stipulation Modifying Briefing Schedule on Flowserve US Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2014-08-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 16 Filed
Date: 2014-08-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous Declaration of Nicole Yuen in Support of Joint Defense Motion in Limine to Exclude Evi
Date: 2014-08-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 1 Filed
Date: 2014-08-22T00:00:00Trial Brief to Exclude Any Reference to, or Evidence of, Prior Settlements Filed
Date: 2014-08-21T00:00:00Miscellaneous Declaration of Nicole Yuen in Support of Joint Defense Motion in Liminie to Exclude Ev
Date: 2014-08-22T00:00:00Objections of John Crane, Inc. Filed
Date: 2014-08-21T00:00:00Trial Brief to Preclude the Defendants from Improper Questioning of Prospective Jurrors During Voir
Date: 2014-08-21T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed
Date: 2014-08-19T00:00:00Trial Brief Expert Witnesses' Establishment of Reliability of Article and California Evidence Code F
Date: 2014-08-21T00:00:00Reply RE: Seperate Statement Filed
Date: 2014-08-21T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2014-08-21T00:00:00Motion in Limine to Preclude All Reference and Testimony Regarding Ostensible Filed
Date: 2014-08-21T00:00:00Trial Brief Examination of Expert Witnesses Regarding "But for" Proximate Cause Filed
Date: 2014-08-21T00:00:00Miscellaneous Plaintiffs' Proposed Jury Instructions Filed
Date: 2014-08-21T00:00:00Response to Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2014-08-21T00:00:00Proof of Service By Electronic Transmission Filed
Date: 2014-08-22T00:00:00Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Filed
Date: 2014-08-21T00:00:00Miscellaneous Defendants Joint Motion in Limine Index Filed
Date: 2014-08-22T00:00:00Response Filed
Date: 2014-08-22T00:00:00Proof of Service Reply in Support of Motion Filed
Date: 2014-08-26T00:00:00Proposed Order Filed for Flowserve US, Inc.
Date: 2014-08-26T00:00:00Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Filed
Date: 2014-08-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement of John Crane, Inc. Filed
Date: 2014-08-22T00:00:00Objections of FMC Corporation on behalf of its former Northern Pump business Filed
Date: 2014-08-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Robert Whalen, Linda Whalen Filed
Date: 2014-08-22T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2014-08-27T00:00:00Reply Filed
Date: 2014-08-22T00:00:00Evidence in Support of Motion Amended Filed
Date: 2014-08-26T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed for FMC Corporation on behalf of its former Northern Pump business
Date: 2014-08-22T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: 2014-08-28T00:00:00Proposed Order Received
Date: 2014-08-22T00:00:00Notice of Filed
Date: 2014-08-29T00:00:00Opposition Deft The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co's MIL to Exclude Evidence Filed
Date: 2014-08-29T00:00:00Objections of Robert Whalen, Linda Whalen Filed
Date: 2014-08-29T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed
Date: 2014-08-29T00:00:00Opposition Deft The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co's MIL to Exclude Reference to Post-1969 Filed
Date: 2014-08-29T00:00:00Opposition to Deft FMC Corp's MIL to Exclude Pltfs Testimony Filed
Date: 2014-08-29T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2014-08-29T00:00:00Opposition Deft's MIL to exclude Pltfs' Experts' Opinion; Request for Evidence Code Section 402 File
Date: 2014-08-29T00:00:00Opposition The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co.'s MIL to Exclude Reference to Goodyear Canada, Inc. Filed
Date: 2014-08-29T00:00:00Opposition Deft's MIL to Exclude Evidence of Certain JCI Products Filed
Date: 2014-08-29T00:00:00Opposition to Joint Defense MIL to Exclude Evidence of Alleged Removal of Durametallic Packing Filed
Date: 2014-08-29T00:00:00Opposition to Joint Defense MIL to Preclude Opinion of Lay Witnesses on Whether Certain Products Con
Date: 2014-08-29T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Taken Under Submission
Date: 2014-08-29T00:00:00Miscellaneous Attendance Sheet Filed
Date: 2014-08-29T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2014-08-29T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Denied
Date: 2014-08-29T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2014-08-29T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Granted
Date: 2014-08-29T00:00:00Miscellaneous Pltf's Page Line Designations of the Videotaped Telephonic Trial Preservation Depositi
Date: 2014-08-29T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2014-08-29T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2014-09-03T00:00:00Miscellaneous Memo of P's & A's In Support of Motion To Re-Open Discovery Re Dr Compton Filed
Date: 2014-09-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous Proposed Order Granting Motion To Re-Open Discovery Re Dr Compton Filed
Date: 2014-09-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous Notice of Motion and Motion To Re-Open And/Or Extend the Close of Expert Discovery Re
Date: 2014-09-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous Proposed Order Granting Motion to Re-Open Re Dr Horn Filed
Date: 2014-09-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine 17 Filed
Date: 2014-09-03T00:00:00Miscellaneous Defendants Amended Joint Motion in Liimine Index Filed
Date: 2014-09-03T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2014-09-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous Declaration of Heather L Caughron In Support of the Motion To Re-Open Re Dr Compton Fi
Date: 2014-09-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine Number 7 Filed
Date: 2014-09-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed
Date: 2014-09-03T00:00:00Proof of Service Trial Brief 1 Motions in Limine 6 and 7 Filed
Date: 2014-09-02T00:00:00Declaration Number 1 Filed
Date: 2014-09-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine Number 6 Filed
Date: 2014-09-02T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Granted
Date: 2014-09-01T00:00:00Miscellaneous Decl of Heather L Caughron In Support of Motion to Re-Open Re Dr Horn Filed
Date: 2014-09-02T00:00:00Trial Brief Number 1 Filed
Date: 2014-09-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous Notice of Motion and Motion To Re-Open And/Or Extend The Close Of Expert Discovery Re
Date: 2014-09-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous Memo of P's & A's in Support of Motion to Re-Open Re Dr Horn Filed
Date: 2014-09-02T00:00:00Opposition to Plaintiffs' Trial Brief to Exclude Any Reference to, or Evidence of, Prior Settlements
Date: 2014-09-03T00:00:00Motion in Limine 2 Filed
Date: 2014-09-03T00:00:00Opposition to PLtfs' Request to Extend Expert Discovery Cut-off to Allow The Deposition of Dr. Barry
Date: 2014-09-03T00:00:00Proof of Service on Motion
Date: 2014-09-03T00:00:00Miscellaneous Sign in Sheet for Settlement Conference Filed
Date: 2014-09-03T00:00:00Opposition to Plaintiffs' Trial Brief Regarding Expert Witnesses' Establishment of Reliability of Ar
Date: 2014-09-03T00:00:00Opposition to Plaintiffs' Trail Brief to Preclude the Defendants from Improper Questioning of Prospe
Date: 2014-09-03T00:00:00Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: 2014-09-03T00:00:00Opposition to Plaintiffs' Trial Brief Re Examination of Expert Witnesses Regarding "But For" Proxima
Date: 2014-09-03T00:00:00Opposition to Pltfs' request to extend xpert discovery.... Filed
Date: 2014-09-04T00:00:00Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Preclude All Reference and Testimony to Ostensible Fil
Date: 2014-09-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Re-Open and/or Extend th
Date: 2014-09-04T00:00:00Declaration re: to Pltfs' request to extend xpert discovery.... Filed by Flowserve US, Inc.
Date: 2014-09-04T00:00:00Objections of Robert Whalen, Linda Whalen Filed
Date: 2014-09-05T00:00:00Proof of Service Ex-Parte by Electronic Transmission Filed
Date: 2014-09-04T00:00:00Miscellaneous Deft The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co's Joinder in John Crane Inc.'s Opposition to Pltfs'
Date: 2014-09-04T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2014-09-05T00:00:00Opposition to Joint Defense Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Hearsay Testimony Filed
Date: 2014-09-05T00:00:00Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Re-open and/or Extend the Close of Expert Discovery as to Dr. C
Date: 2014-09-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous Deft The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co's Joinder in John Crane Inc.'s Opposition Filed
Date: 2014-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed
Date: 2014-09-05T00:00:00Application Re: Permission to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed
Date: 2014-09-04T00:00:00Miscellaneous Deft The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co's Joinder in Flowserve US, Inc.'s Opposition to Plt
Date: 2014-09-04T00:00:00Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Re-open and/or Extend the Close of Expert Discovery as to Dr. H
Date: 2014-09-05T00:00:00Opposition to Joint Defense Motion in Limine to Exclude Charles Ay, or in the Alternative a Request
Date: 2014-09-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous Plaintiffs' Page Line Designations of the Deposition of William Rees Filed
Date: 2014-09-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous Plaintiffs' Page and Line Designations for the Deposition Testimony of Steven McEathro
Date: 2014-09-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous Document Index-The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company Filed
Date: 2014-09-09T00:00:00Miscellaneous Plaintiffs' Page Line Designations of the Videotaped Telephonic Deposition of Robert W
Date: 2014-09-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous Plaintiffs' Page Line Designations of the Videotaped Telephonic Trial Preservation Dep
Date: 2014-09-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous Plaintiffs' Page and Line Designations for the Deposition Testimony of Donald Metzler
Date: 2014-09-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous Document Index - Goulds Pumps, Inc. Filed
Date: 2014-09-09T00:00:00Trial Brief Regarding Case Overview Filed
Date: 2014-09-08T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2014-09-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous Plaintiffs' Page Line Designations of the Deposition of Charles F. Josvanger Filed
Date: 2014-09-05T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Granted
Date: 2014-09-05T00:00:00Application Re: Permission to Appear Pro Hac Vice Granted
Date: 2014-09-05T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2014-09-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous Plaintiffs' Page Line Designations of the Deposition of Deryl Dack Filed
Date: 2014-09-05T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed
Date: 2014-09-05T00:00:00Objections of Robert Whalen, Linda Whalen Filed
Date: 2014-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2014-09-08T00:00:00Miscellaneous Plaintiffs' Amended Page and Line Designations for the Deposition Testimony of John T.
Date: 2014-09-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous Attendance Sheet Filed
Date: 2014-09-05T00:00:00Notice of Filed
Date: 2014-09-05T00:00:00Notice of of Mandatory Settlement Conference Filed
Date: 2014-09-08T00:00:00Opposition to Deft's Trial Brief Re Stay of California Case Pending Outcome of Concurrent Federal Ac
Date: 2014-09-09T00:00:00List of Witness Plaintiffs' Joint Witness List Filed
Date: 2014-09-09T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2014-09-18T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2014-09-22T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2014-09-16T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party Parker-Hannifin Corporation Filed
Date: 2014-09-17T00:00:00Exhibit Record Plaintiffs' Filed
Date: 2014-09-09T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2014-09-15T00:00:00Miscellaneous Document Index - Flowserve US Inc. Corporation Filed
Date: 2014-09-09T00:00:00Miscellaneous Document Index - John Crane, Inc. Filed
Date: 2014-09-09T00:00:00Miscellaneous Document Index - IMO Industries, Inc. Filed
Date: 2014-09-09T00:00:00List of Witness Plaintiffs' Scope of Testimony Witness List Filed
Date: 2014-09-09T00:00:00List of Witness Plaintiffs' Alpha Witness List Filed
Date: 2014-09-09T00:00:00Miscellaneous Plaintiffs' Page and Line Designations for the Deposition Testimony of Ernest W. DeMar
Date: 2014-09-18T00:00:00Amended Minutes of 9/22/2014 amended on 9/23/2014
Date: 2014-09-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous Designation of Trial Testimony Filed
Date: 2014-09-26T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2014-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2014-09-23T00:00:00Order Filed
Date: 2014-09-29T00:00:00Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2014-09-25T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2014-10-01T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2014-09-23T00:00:00Proposed Judgment Filed
Date: 2014-09-22T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party IMO Industries, Inc. Filed
Date: 2014-09-23T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Completed
Date: 2014-09-25T00:00:00Miscellaneous Sign in Sheet for Settlement Conference Filed
Date: 2014-09-25T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2014-09-24T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2014-09-29T00:00:00Judgment Entered
Date: 2014-10-03T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2014-10-10T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2014-10-02T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2014-10-07T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2014-10-15T00:00:00Summary Judgment - Partial As to FMC Corporation on behalf of its former Northern Pump business File
Date: 2014-10-03T00:00:00Miscellaneous Juror Question Filed
Date: 2014-10-14T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2014-10-06T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2014-10-14T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2014-10-08T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed for FMC Corporation on behalf of its former Northern Pump busine
Date: 2014-10-14T00:00:00Motion in Limine Filed
Date: 2014-10-15T00:00:00Trial Brief Re The Admissibility of Deft's Prior Testimony As A Party Admission Filed
Date: 2014-10-16T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2014-10-16T00:00:00Miscellaneous Juror Question Form Filed
Date: 2014-10-16T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Completed
Date: 2014-10-17T00:00:00Miscellaneous Juror Question Form Filed
Date: 2014-10-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous Juror Question Form Filed
Date: 2014-10-22T00:00:00Declaration Of Kurt T. Putnam Filed
Date: 2014-10-27T00:00:00Miscellaneous re: Pltfs' EXhibit List Filed
Date: 2014-10-24T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2014-10-21T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2014-10-27T00:00:00Miscellaneous re: revised Special Verdict Form Filed
Date: 2014-10-24T00:00:00Rejection Letter Issued on Motion
Date: 2014-10-22T00:00:00Exhibit Record Court's Filed
Date: 2014-10-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous Def John Crane Inc.'s Page-Line Designations from 7-25,26-13 Depo TX of CBS Corp. File
Date: 2014-10-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous Defendant's Motion For Judgment For Nonsuit On The Issues Of Liability For Gaskets Fil
Date: 2014-10-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous Defendant John Crane Inc.'s Designation of the March 28, 2011 Responses of Warren Pump
Date: 2014-10-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous re: Document Index Filed
Date: 2014-10-24T00:00:00Miscellaneous Def John Crane Inc.'s Page-Line Designations from 4-5-07 Depo TX of Delaval Steam Turb
Date: 2014-10-23T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed
Date: 2014-10-27T00:00:00Miscellaneous Juror Question Form Filed
Date: 2014-10-21T00:00:00Objections of Robert Whalen, Linda Whalen Filed
Date: 2014-10-24T00:00:00Miscellaneous Juror Question Form Filed
Date: 2014-10-27T00:00:00Miscellaneous Def John Crane Inc.'s Page-Line Designations from 2-13-07 Depo TX of Yarway Corp Filed
Date: 2014-10-23T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2014-10-22T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2014-10-20T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed
Date: 2014-10-20T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed
Date: 2014-10-23T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Completed
Date: 2014-10-24T00:00:00Miscellaneous Def John Crane Inc.'s Page-Line Designation from 10-15-08 Depo TX of Ingersoll-Rand Co
Date: 2014-10-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous Def John Crane Inc.'s Designation of General Electric 4-24-06 Sup Responses to Master
Date: 2014-10-23T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2014-10-23T00:00:00Plaintiff's Proposed Jury Instructions Filed
Date: 2014-10-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Mistrial Filed
Date: 2014-10-27T00:00:00Miscellaneous Juror Question Form Filed
Date: 2014-10-28T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2014-11-03T00:00:00Miscellaneous re: as read in trial: designations for the trial testimony of George R McKillop Lodged
Date: 2014-11-04T00:00:00Miscellaneous re: As read in trail: Designations for the Deposition testimont of George springs Lodg
Date: 2014-11-04T00:00:00Jury Verdict (Special) Filed
Date: 2014-10-30T00:00:00Miscellaneous Receipt for Removal of Admitted Exhibits-Defendant Filed
Date: 2014-10-30T00:00:00Miscellaneous re: Joint Designations of Former Testimony o fRobert whalen Lodged
Date: 2014-11-04T00:00:00Exhibit Lists Defendant's Filed
Date: 2014-10-30T00:00:00Log of Court Reporter(s) Filed
Date: 2014-10-30T00:00:00Miscellaneous re: as read in trial: Designations for the depositon Testimony Lodged
Date: 2014-11-05T00:00:00Judgment after Jury Trial Filed
Date: 2014-11-03T00:00:00Miscellaneous RE: AS READ IN TRIAL RE: DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF GEORGE R. McKILLOP Lodged
Date: 2014-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Release and Order for Destruction of Exhibits Filed
Date: 2014-11-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Filed
Date: 2014-10-28T00:00:00Miscellaneous re: as read in trial: designations for Linda Whalen's Lodged
Date: 2014-11-04T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2014-10-28T00:00:00Miscellaneous Receipt for Removal of Non-Admitted Exhibits-Plaintiffs Filed
Date: 2014-10-30T00:00:00Miscellaneous Receipt for Removal of Non-Admitted Exhibits-Defendant Filed
Date: 2014-10-30T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2014-10-29T00:00:00Miscellaneous Receipt for Removal of Admitted Exhibits-Plaintiffs Filed
Date: 2014-10-30T00:00:00List of Jurors and Fees Paid Filed
Date: 2014-10-30T00:00:00Stipulation to Extend Time for Plaintiffs to Move to Strike or Tax Costs Filed
Date: 2014-10-30T00:00:00Complaint Asbestos Filed (Amended)
Date: 2014-01-29T00:00:00Order re Case Management Filed
Date: 2014-02-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Robert Whalen
Date: 2014-01-29T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 03/28/2014 09:15 AM D- 30
Date: 2014-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge Issued
Date: 2014-02-05T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2014-01-29T00:00:00Order Re: Appointment Of Designated Defense Counsel Filed
Date: 2014-02-05T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for John Crane, Inc.
Date: 2014-02-26T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Metropolitan Live Insurance Company
Date: 2014-03-05T00:00:00Complex Designation Order - Case Ruled Complex Filed
Date: 2014-02-05T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: 2014-03-06T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: 2014-02-26T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Anchor Darling Valve Company
Date: 2014-03-05T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service on Complaint Asbestos As to John Crane, Inc. Filed
Date: 2014-03-07T00:00:00Miscellaneous Preliminary Fact Sheet Filed
Date: 2014-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2014-02-18T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: 2014-03-05T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for IMO Industries, Inc.
Date: 2014-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Initial Case Management Order Filed
Date: 2014-02-07T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service on Complaint Asbestos As to Metropolitan Live Insurance Company Filed
Date: 2014-03-07T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Metalclad Insulation Corporation
Date: 2014-02-14T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Date: 2014-03-06T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2014-02-06T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Flowserve US, Inc.
Date: 2014-03-07T00:00:00Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed
Date: 2014-03-05T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed
Date: 2014-03-04T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc.
Date: 2014-03-07T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Goulds Pumps, Inc.
Date: 2014-03-24T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed
Date: 2014-03-12T00:00:00Stipulation And Order Authorizing Electronic Service Filed
Date: 2014-03-14T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc. Filed
Date: 2014-03-25T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Fisher Controls International LLC Filed
Date: 2014-03-21T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service on Complaint Asbestos As to IMO Industries, Inc. Filed
Date: 2014-03-07T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Boss Manufacturing Company
Date: 2014-03-20T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: 2014-03-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement of John Crane, Inc. Filed
Date: 2014-03-20T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Metalclad Insulation Corporation Filed
Date: 2014-03-25T00:00:00Miscellaneous Designated Defense Counsel Case Management Statement Filed
Date: 2014-03-21T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service on Complaint Asbestos As to Flowserve US, Inc. Filed
Date: 2014-03-07T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed
Date: 2014-03-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement of J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc. Filed
Date: 2014-03-13T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Associated Insulation of California Filed
Date: 2014-03-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Robert Whalen, Linda Whalen Filed
Date: 2014-03-14T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for FMC Corporation on behalf of its former Northern Pump business
Date: 2014-03-20T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to FMC Corporation on behalf of its former Northern Pump business
Date: 2014-03-25T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition - Opposition Filed
Date: 2014-05-02T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2014-03-28T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Thomas Dee Engineering Company Filed
Date: 2014-03-25T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2014-04-25T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Thomas Dee Engineering Company
Date: 2014-04-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement of John Crane, Inc. Filed
Date: 2014-04-15T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Goulds Pumps, Inc.
Date: 2014-05-05T00:00:00Notice of Order Re: Case Management Filed
Date: 2014-03-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed for Defendant
Date: 2014-05-05T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Red-White Valve Corp.
Date: 2014-03-27T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2014-03-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Robert Whalen, Linda Whalen Filed
Date: 2014-04-18T00:00:00Rejection Letter Issued on Answer to Complaint
Date: 2014-04-10T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service on Complaint Asbestos As to Red-White Valve Corp. Filed
Date: 2014-04-02T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Goulds Pumps, Inc. Filed
Date: 2014-04-03T00:00:00Miscellaneous Designated Defense Counsel Case Mangement Statement Filed
Date: 2014-04-15T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Parker-Hannifin Corporation Filed
Date: 2014-03-25T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2014-05-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition supporting Joinder to Def John Crane, Inc's Oppos
Date: 2014-05-05T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2014-04-25T00:00:00Opposition Conditional Filed
Date: 2014-05-05T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Boss Manufacturing Company Filed
Date: 2014-04-16T00:00:00Opposition Filed
Date: 2014-05-01T00:00:00Motion for Preference Filed by Robert Whalen, Linda Whalen
Date: 2014-04-17T00:00:00Opposition Filed
Date: 2014-05-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous Designated Defense Counsel CMC Statement Filed
Date: 2014-05-09T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed
Date: 2014-05-05T00:00:00Motion for Preference Granted
Date: 2014-05-16T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2014-05-16T00:00:00Reply : Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant Opposition (s) to Motion for Order Granting Preference Filed
Date: 2014-05-09T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2014-05-16T00:00:00Miscellaneous Attendance Sheet Filed
Date: 2014-05-16T00:00:00Miscellaneous Joinder in Opposition to Motion for Preference Filed
Date: 2014-05-06T00:00:00Miscellaneous Approval of Counsel of All Admitted Exhibits Presented to Jurors During Deliberation
Date: 2014-10-30T00:00:00Declaration in Support Of Kurt T. Putnam Filed
Date: 2014-10-28T00:00:00Miscellaneous Juror Question Form Filed
Date: 2014-10-30T00:00:00Final Jury Instructions Filed
Date: 2014-10-29T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Completed
Date: 2014-10-30T00:00:00Judgment Entered
Date: 2014-11-03T00:00:00Miscellaneous Re: as read in trial: designations for the videotaped trial of Aallan H. Smith Lodged
Date: 2014-11-04T00:00:00Exhibit Lists Plaintiffs' Filed
Date: 2014-10-30T00:00:00Miscellaneous re: Designation of the trial testimony... Lodged
Date: 2014-11-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous re: As read in trial: Designations for the depositin testimony ... Lodged
Date: 2014-11-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous as read in trial: designations for John Crane Lodged
Date: 2014-11-04T00:00:00Miscellaneous re: as read in trial: Designations for the trial Testimony ... Lodged
Date: 2014-11-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous re: as read in trial: Designation of the trial testimony of George Mckillop Lodged
Date: 2014-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed
Date: 2014-11-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous re: As Read in trial: designations for videotaped trial preservation Deposition of...
Date: 2014-11-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous re: As read in trial: Designtions/ trial preservatin testimony Lodged
Date: 2014-11-05T00:00:00Declaration of Heather -Ann Young Filed
Date: 2014-11-06T00:00:00Miscellaneous Notice of Motion and Motion Regarding Allocation of Pre-Trial Settlements Filed
Date: 2014-11-06T00:00:00Declaration in Support Of Jennifer L Alesio Filed
Date: 2014-12-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous re: as read in trial: Designations of the Videotaped telephonic trial preservatin Depo
Date: 2014-11-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous re: as read in trial : Designations of the Videotaped Telephonic Depositon .. Lodged
Date: 2014-11-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous Invoice for Jury Fees - 10-23-14 - Plaintiffs Filed
Date: 2014-11-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: 2014-12-10T00:00:00Miscellaneous Invoice for Jury Fees - 10-23-14 - Defendant Filed
Date: 2014-11-05T00:00:00Motion for New Trial Filed by John Crane, Inc.
Date: 2014-11-18T00:00:00Miscellaneous Invoice for Jury Fees - 10-2-14 - Plaintiffs Filed
Date: 2014-11-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous Invoice for Jury Fees - 10-16-14 - Defendant Filed
Date: 2014-11-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed for Robert Whalen, Linda Whalen
Date: 2014-11-19T00:00:00Motion for New Trial Filed for Debtor
Date: 2014-11-18T00:00:00Miscellaneous Notice of Motion for Expert Costs Filed
Date: 2014-11-19T00:00:00Miscellaneous re: as red in trial: Designations for John Crance inc's General order 129 response Lod
Date: 2014-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed
Date: 2014-11-26T00:00:00Motion For Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict Filed by John Crane, Inc.
Date: 2014-11-18T00:00:00Opposition Filed
Date: 2014-12-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Filed
Date: 2014-11-26T00:00:00Miscellaneous Memorandum of Points and Authorities Filed
Date: 2014-11-19T00:00:00Summary Judgment - Partial As to FMC Corporation on behalf of its former Northern Pump business File
Date: 2014-11-20T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs Filed for Debtor
Date: 2014-12-02T00:00:00Declaration in Support Jennifer L. Alesio Filed
Date: 2014-12-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous Invoice for Jury Fees - 10-30-14 - Defendant Filed
Date: 2014-11-05T00:00:00Order On Stipulation Re: Waiver Of Costs And Waiver Of Right To Appeal Filed
Date: 2014-12-11T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed
Date: 2014-12-12T00:00:00Miscellaneous Invoice for Jury Fees 10-30-14 - Plaintiffs Filed
Date: 2014-11-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous Invoice for Jury Fees 10-2-14 - Defendant Filed
Date: 2014-11-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous Declaration of Jennifer L. Alesio Filed
Date: 2014-11-19T00:00:00Motion to Vacate/Set Aside Judgment Filed for Debtor
Date: 2014-11-18T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Anchor Darling Valve Company Filed
Date: 2014-11-14T00:00:00Miscellaneous Invoice for Jury Fees - 9-25-14 - Plaintiffs Filed
Date: 2014-11-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous Invoice for Jury Fees - 9-25-14 - Defendant Filed
Date: 2014-11-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous Plaintiff's Motion Regarding Allocation of Pre-Trial Settlements Filed
Date: 2014-11-06T00:00:00Judgment Entered
Date: 2014-11-20T00:00:00Miscellaneous Invoice for Jury Fees - 10-16-14 - Plaintiffs Filed
Date: 2014-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2014-11-24T00:00:00Rejection Letter Issued on Motion for New Trial
Date: 2014-11-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support support doc. r_1674609 comfirmed 11/18 Filed
Date: 2014-11-24T00:00:00Opposition Request for Remittitur Filed
Date: 2014-12-05T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2014-12-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Amended Filed
Date: 2015-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2015-02-11T00:00:00Motion Filed by John Crane, Inc.
Date: 2015-02-26T00:00:00Undertaking on Appeal Filed for Debtor
Date: 2015-02-17T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party Metropolitan Live Insurance Company File
Date: 2015-02-05T00:00:00Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed
Date: April 27, 2015Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2015-01-09T00:00:00Notice to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed
Date: 2015-01-16T00:00:00Motion For Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict Denied
Date: 2014-12-18T00:00:00Reply Brief on Defendant John Crane Inc.'s Motion to Tax Costs Filed
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Notice of Appeal Filed by John Crane, Inc.
Date: 2015-01-16T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs - Motion Rescheduled
Date: 2015-01-09T00:00:00Reminder Notice to Court Reporter to Prepare Transcripts Filed
Date: 2015-03-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: April 30, 2015Remittitur Filed
Date: May 05, 2015Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2014-12-26T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed
Date: October 02, 2019Receipt for Record on Appeal of Robert Whalen Filed
Date: April 01, 2015Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: 2014-12-19T00:00:00Receipt for Notice of Appeal by DCA Filed
Date: 2015-01-27T00:00:00Designation of Record Filed
Date: 2015-01-22T00:00:00Notice to Court Reporter to Prepare Transcripts Filed
Date: 2015-01-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (Amended) on Filed
Date: 2014-12-15T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Motion to Tax Costs 01/09/2015 09:00 AM D- 113
Date: 2015-01-05T00:00:00Declaration of Robert L. Nelder Re Request for Reporter's Transcript on Appeal Filed
Date: 2015-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Defendant John Crane Inc.'s Notice of Waiver of Deposit Fees Filed
Date: 2015-02-02T00:00:00Motion to Vacate/Set Aside Judgment Denied
Date: 2014-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Waiver of Costs to Prepare Transcripts from Court Reporters Filed
Date: 2015-01-28T00:00:00Motion Denied
Date: 2014-12-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed
Date: 2014-12-26T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The
Date: 2015-01-26T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2015-02-25T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party Goulds Pumps, Inc. Filed
Date: 2015-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Certification of Record Filed
Date: March 26, 2015Rejection Letter Issued on Motion
Date: 2015-02-26T00:00:00Amended Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: 2015-02-27T00:00:00Receipt for Record on Appeal of Robert Whalen Filed
Date: April 03, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.