Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Operation Dignity, Inc. Rainbow Court, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Duszynski, Robert, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Winifred Y. Smith presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2014 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Cycle Time145 days |
Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued
Date: 2014-01-30T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2014-01-29T00:00:00Application Re: Posting Summons and Complaint Filed for Operation Dignity, Inc./ Rainbow Court
Date: 2014-02-25T00:00:00Compliance Hearing 07/10/2014 09:00 AM D- 1
Date: May 02, 2014Unlawful Detainer Court Trial 04/24/2014 09:00 AM D- 109
Date: 2014-04-01T00:00:00Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed
Date: 2014-01-29T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: June 23, 2014Answer to Complaint Filed for Robert Duszynski
Date: 2014-03-07T00:00:00Memo To Set Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2014-03-21T00:00:00Request for Stipulation Filed for Plaintiff
Date: May 02, 2014Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Operation Dignity, Inc./ Rainbow Court
Date: 2014-01-29T00:00:00Rejection Letter Issued on Memo To Set
Date: 2014-03-21T00:00:00Memo To Set Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2014-04-01T00:00:00Master Jury Trial 05/02/2014 08:45 AM D- 1
Date: April 09, 2014Master Jury Trial Called and Completed
Date: May 02, 2014Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: 2014-04-08T00:00:00Application Re: Posting Summons and Complaint Granted
Date: 2014-02-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.