Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Foot Locker Retail Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Madison Bay Fair Llc, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Michael M. Markman presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management140 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2014 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
Time To Trial140 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions604 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time1843 days |
Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2014-09-16T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2014-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Service Motion in Limine No. 1, 2, 3, 4 Filed
Date: 2015-05-26T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2015-04-17T00:00:00Miscellaneous Plaintiff's Motion in limine to Exclude Trial Exhibits TX075 Filed
Date: 2015-05-22T00:00:00Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed
Date: 2014-01-29T00:00:00Objections to Evidence Filed for Madison Bay Fair LLC
Date: 2015-04-16T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed
Date: 2015-04-07T00:00:00Order Granting Pre Trial Order Filed
Date: 2015-04-24T00:00:00Motion in Limine Defendant's MIL No. 1 Filed
Date: 2015-05-08T00:00:00Notice of Selection of Neutral Filed
Date: 2014-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2014-01-31T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed for Madison Bay Fair LLC
Date: 2015-02-05T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2014-09-16T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 06/18/2014 02:30 PM D- 510
Date: 2014-01-31T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Madison Bay Fair LLC Filed
Date: 2014-02-10T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Madison Bay Fair LLC
Date: 2014-03-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Foot Locker Retail Inc Filed
Date: 2014-06-03T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2014-06-18T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2014-06-18T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration in Support of Mohammad Walizadeh Filed
Date: 2015-04-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Footlocker Retail Inc
Date: 2014-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2015-04-16T00:00:00Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 05/21/2015 01:30 PM D- 702
Date: 2015-04-23T00:00:00Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts Filed for Defendant
Date: 2015-04-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Madison Bay Fair LLC Filed
Date: 2014-06-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service on Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty As to Filed
Date: 2015-02-09T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Denied
Date: 2015-04-22T00:00:00Proposed Order Received
Date: 2015-04-16T00:00:00Declaration in Support Madison Bay Fair LLC's Motions in Limine Filed
Date: 2015-05-08T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Taken Under Submission
Date: 2015-04-21T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-04-21T00:00:00Reply Filed
Date: 2015-04-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine Defendant's MIL No. 2 Filed
Date: 2015-05-08T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2015-05-08T00:00:00Miscellaneous Defendant's Selection of Excerpts of Plaintiff's Responses to Requests for Admissions
Date: 2015-05-22T00:00:00Opposition to Motion in Limine NO. 2 Filed
Date: 2015-05-15T00:00:00Miscellaneous Defendant's Counter-Designations of Deposition Testimony for Use at Trial Filed
Date: 2015-05-22T00:00:00Opposition to Motion in Limine NO. 1 Filed
Date: 2015-05-15T00:00:00Civil Court Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2015-05-28T00:00:00Miscellaneous Plaintff's Foot Locker and Madison Bay Fair Factual Stipulations Filed
Date: 2015-05-22T00:00:00Opposition Filed
Date: 2015-05-15T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed
Date: 2015-05-21T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 3 Filed
Date: 2015-05-08T00:00:00Settlement Conference Statement of Madison Bay Fair LLC Filed
Date: 2015-05-14T00:00:00Notice of of its Intent to Use A Court Reporter at Trial Filed
Date: 2015-05-20T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 1 Filed
Date: 2015-05-08T00:00:00Miscellaneous Plaintiff Deposition Designations Filed
Date: 2015-05-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous Defendant's Trial Brief Filed
Date: 2015-05-22T00:00:00Notice of to Attend Trial Filed
Date: 2015-05-12T00:00:00Miscellaneous Plaintiff's Excerpts of Plaintiff's Responses to Requests for Admission and Interrogat
Date: 2015-05-22T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2015-05-08T00:00:00Miscellaneous Defendant's Motion in Limine #3 Objections to Plaintiff's Exhibits Filed
Date: 2015-05-22T00:00:00List of Witness for Plaintiff Filed
Date: 2015-05-22T00:00:00Settlement Conference Statement of Madison Bay Fair LLC Filed
Date: 2015-05-15T00:00:00Civil Court Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2015-05-26T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-05-22T00:00:00Opposition to Motion in Limine NO. 3 Filed
Date: 2015-05-15T00:00:00Motion in Limine No.2 Filed
Date: 2015-05-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2015-05-12T00:00:00Motion in Limine No.4 Filed
Date: 2015-05-08T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2015-05-15T00:00:00Declaration in Support Filed
Date: 2015-05-15T00:00:00Civil Court Trial 06/01/2015 09:00 AM D- 510
Date: 2015-06-01T00:00:00Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-05-21T00:00:00Miscellaneous Receipt for Withdrawal of Exhibits Filed
Date: 2015-05-22T00:00:00Order Granting Stipulation and Order re Court Reporter Filed
Date: 2015-05-22T00:00:00Civil Court Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2015-05-27T00:00:00Appendix Filed
Date: 2015-05-15T00:00:00Settlement Conference Statement of Foot Locker Retail Inc Lodged
Date: 2015-05-15T00:00:00Miscellaneous Plaintiff's proposed trial exhibit list Filed
Date: 2015-05-22T00:00:00List of Witness Defendant's Witness List Filed
Date: 2015-05-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous Additional Fact Stipulations Filed
Date: 2015-06-01T00:00:00Civil Court Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2015-06-01T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: 2015-06-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous Log of Court Reporters used at trial Filed
Date: 2015-06-03T00:00:00Objection Filed
Date: 2015-09-21T00:00:00Miscellaneous List of Witnesses used at trial Filed
Date: 2015-06-03T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-09-25T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs Filed for Debtor
Date: 2015-10-28T00:00:00Trial Brief Post Filed
Date: 2015-06-25T00:00:00Notice to Court Reporter to Prepare Transcripts Filed
Date: 2015-11-02T00:00:00Judgment after Court Trial - Contested Filed
Date: 2015-09-25T00:00:00Objections of Madison Bay Fair LLC Filed
Date: 2015-09-14T00:00:00Notice to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed
Date: 2015-10-29T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees Filed for Creditor
Date: 2015-10-23T00:00:00Designation of Record Filed
Date: 2015-10-28T00:00:00Order Granting Stipulation Regarding Trial Exhibits Filed
Date: 2015-06-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed for Madison Bay Fair LLC
Date: 2015-10-13T00:00:00Civil Court Trial Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-06-25T00:00:00Order Granting Stipulation and Order Re Court Reporter Filed
Date: 2015-06-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous Closing Brief Filed
Date: 2015-06-25T00:00:00Order Granting Stipulation Re: Court Reporter Filed
Date: 2015-06-03T00:00:00Civil Court Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2015-06-03T00:00:00Proposed Statement of Decision Issued
Date: 2015-08-25T00:00:00Civil Court Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2015-06-02T00:00:00Ruling Taken Under Submission
Date: 2015-06-25T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service on Judgment after Court Trial - Contested As to Foot Locker Retail Inc Fil
Date: 2015-10-28T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-11-02T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte 11/02/2015 02:30 PM D- 510
Date: 2015-10-30T00:00:00Objections of Foot Locker Retail Inc Filed
Date: 2015-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed
Date: 2015-09-25T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2015-09-25T00:00:00Declaration of Gregory D. Call Re Plaintiff Foot Locker Retail's Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: 2015-10-28T00:00:00Judgment Entered
Date: 2015-09-25T00:00:00Application Re: Continuance of Hearing Granted
Date: 2015-11-02T00:00:00Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Delay Hearing Date on Defendant's Motion Filed
Date: 2015-11-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous Receipt for Withdrawal Exhibits Filed
Date: 2015-10-30T00:00:00Notice to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed
Date: 2015-11-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2015-10-28T00:00:00Application Re: Continuance of Hearing Filed for Foot Locker Retail Inc
Date: 2015-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Cross-Appeal Filed by Madison Bay Fair LLC
Date: 2015-11-06T00:00:00Notice of Appeal Filed by Foot Locker Retail Inc
Date: 2015-10-28T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-11-24T00:00:00Designation of Record Filed
Date: 2015-11-13T00:00:00Declaration in Support Of Rebecca M. Suarez Filed
Date: 2015-12-08T00:00:00Reply Memorandum Filed
Date: 2015-12-08T00:00:00Receipt for Record on Appeal of Foot Locker Retail Inc Filed
Date: 2016-05-18T00:00:00Notice to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed
Date: 2016-01-05T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs - Granted in Part
Date: 2015-12-16T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-01-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Madison Bay Fair LLC Filed
Date: 2017-05-17T00:00:00Returned Mail: Order on Motion to Tax Costs for defendant Filed
Date: 2016-01-04T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-06-09T00:00:00Opposition to Foot Locker's Motion to Tax Costs Filed
Date: 2015-12-02T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees Taken Under Submission
Date: 2015-12-15T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 06/09/2016 02:30 PM D- 302
Date: 2016-03-18T00:00:00Reply Brief in Support of Motion Filed
Date: 2015-12-08T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2016-06-09T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate Filed
Date: 2016-03-25T00:00:00Receipt for Notice of Appeal by DCA Filed
Date: 2016-03-14T00:00:00Notice of Certification of Record Filed
Date: 2016-03-25T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-12-15T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees Granted
Date: 2015-12-16T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2015-11-24T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 06/07/2017 09:00 AM D- 302
Date: 2017-05-18T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-12-15T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs Taken Under Submission
Date: 2015-12-15T00:00:00Undertaking on Appeal Filed for Debtor
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: June 07, 2017Opposition Filed
Date: 2015-12-02T00:00:00Receipt for Record on Appeal of Foot Locker Retail Inc Filed
Date: 2016-05-04T00:00:00Order from DCA Filed
Date: 2016-02-11T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: January 31, 2019Notice of Appeal Filed by Foot Locker Retail Inc
Date: 2016-01-05T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2016-12-15T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2016-01-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Foot Locker Retail Inc Filed
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00Case Management Conf Continuance 03/04/2019 09:00 AM D- 16
Date: February 08, 2019Notice to Court Reporter to Prepare Transcripts Filed
Date: 2015-10-29T00:00:00Receipt for Record on Appeal of Foot Locker Retail Inc Filed
Date: 2016-04-11T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: June 07, 2017Remittitur Filed
Date: February 06, 2019Opinion of District Court of Appeals Filed
Date: November 30, 2018Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: 2017-05-31T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for Madison Bay Fair LLC
Date: July 13, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.