Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Kana , Lesley, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Ronni B. MacLaren presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2014 |
CategoryCollections |
Time To Trial138 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions261 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: 2014-04-21T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2014-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail on Answer Filed
Date: 2014-04-04T00:00:00Complaint - Collections Filed
Date: 2014-01-29T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 06/16/2014 09:00 AM D- 25
Date: 2014-03-27T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Lesley Kana Filed
Date: 2014-02-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for MIdland Funding LLC
Date: 2014-01-29T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Lesley Kana
Date: 2014-03-21T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2014-06-16T00:00:00Declaration of Venue Filed
Date: 2014-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2014-03-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement of MIdland Funding LLC Filed
Date: 2014-05-27T00:00:00Judgment after Court Trial - Contested Filed
Date: 2014-10-17T00:00:00Motion for Admissions Deemed Admitted Granted
Date: 2014-08-22T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed
Date: 2014-10-17T00:00:00Judgment Entered
Date: 2014-10-17T00:00:00Memo of credits interest & costs after judgment Filed for MIdland Funding LLC
Date: April 19, 2016Civil Court Trial Commenced and Completed
Date: 2014-10-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed for MIdland Funding LLC
Date: 2014-10-17T00:00:00Motion for Admissions Deemed Admitted Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2014-07-14T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2014-08-22T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2014-09-23T00:00:00Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed
Date: July 10, 2020Memo of credits interest & costs after judgment Filed for MIdland Funding LLC
Date: January 15, 2020Writ of Execution - Unsatisfied from Santa Clara Filed
Date: April 17, 2018Writ of Execution - Unsatisfied from LA Filed
Date: March 02, 2020Writ of Execution - Unsatisfied from LA Filed
Date: June 15, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.