Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Millbrook, Jerry, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Ramos, Victoria Hope, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Stephen Kaus presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management139 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
Time To Trial484 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions741 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time741 days |
Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2014-07-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (Amended) on Motion Filed
Date: 2014-06-11T00:00:00Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Motion Rescheduled
Date: 2014-07-10T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-04-29T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed
Date: 2014-07-17T00:00:00Proposed Order Received
Date: 2014-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2014-01-02T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2014-07-24T00:00:00Proof of Service on Motion
Date: 2014-06-11T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-01-14T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Civil Law and Motion 07/10/2014 03:00 PM D- 514
Date: 2014-06-06T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2014-05-19T00:00:00Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Granted
Date: 2014-07-17T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2014-05-19T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2014-09-22T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Victoria Hope Ramos
Date: 2014-01-30T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 05/19/2014 03:00 PM D- 514
Date: 2014-01-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Victoria Hope Ramos Filed
Date: 2014-05-15T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2014-09-22T00:00:00Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Jerry Millbrook
Date: 2014-06-06T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Victoria Hope Ramos Filed
Date: 2014-05-02T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2014-07-17T00:00:00Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Jerry Millbrook Filed
Date: 2014-05-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Jerry Millbrook
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Victoria Hope Ramos Filed
Date: 2015-04-27T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 01/14/2015 03:01 PM D- 23
Date: 2014-12-16T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2015-01-14T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2015-04-29T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 04/29/2015 03:00 PM D- 23
Date: 2015-02-04T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-08-05T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-10-14T00:00:00Judgment Entered
Date: January 11, 2016Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2015-08-05T00:00:00Ruling Taken Under Submission
Date: January 08, 2016Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2015-10-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for Victoria Hope Ramos
Date: 2015-12-11T00:00:00Civil Court Trial Commenced and Completed
Date: January 08, 2016Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: December 18, 2015Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: December 17, 2015Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: December 18, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.