Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Dill , April, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case against Mainz Brady Group, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with George C. Hernandez, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGeorge C. Hernandez, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management5 days |
Filing DateOctober 23, 2013 |
CategoryOther Employment |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Case Cycle Time118 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for April Dill
Date: 2013-10-23T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: December 30, 2013Miscellaneous /Transfer Fee paid on 02/14/2014 per receipt no. 593247 Filed
Date: February 18, 2014Order for Change of Venue (Out of County) Filed
Date: January 02, 2014Complaint - Other Employment Filed
Date: 2013-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: January 09, 2014Case Management Statement of April Dill Filed
Date: December 27, 2013Case Management Conference 01/08/2014 02:30 PM D- 17
Date: 2013-10-28T00:00:00Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-12-02T00:00:00Motion Granted
Date: 2013-12-02T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2013-10-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Mainz Brady Group Filed
Date: December 23, 2013Request Re: Other Ex Parte Granted
Date: January 02, 2014Request Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: December 30, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.