Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Marshall, Robin, Carter, Richard, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Mayeste, Revlon, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Michael E. Ballachey presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 16, 2013 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Time To Trial36 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions41 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time74 days |
Miscellaneous Request for Stay before Writ of Possession Issued Filed
Date: June 26, 2013Answer to Complaint Filed for Revlon Mayeste
Date: 2013-05-28T00:00:00Civil Court Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2013-06-21T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2013-05-16T00:00:00Judgment Entered
Date: 2013-06-26T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2013-05-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous Exhibit List / Witness List Filed
Date: 2013-06-26T00:00:00Judgment after Court Trial Filed
Date: 2013-06-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Robin Marshall
Date: 2013-05-16T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2013-05-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous Defendant Exhibit List Filed
Date: 2013-06-24T00:00:00Statement Defendant's Statement of the Case Filed
Date: 2013-06-24T00:00:00Master Jury Trial 06/21/2013 08:45 AM D- 1
Date: 2013-06-03T00:00:00Civil Court Trial Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-06-21T00:00:00Memo To Set Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2013-05-31T00:00:00Civil Court Trial Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-06-26T00:00:00Master Jury Trial Called and Completed
Date: 2013-06-21T00:00:00Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued
Date: 2013-05-17T00:00:00Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed
Date: 2013-05-16T00:00:00Memo To Set Filed for Defendant
Date: 2013-05-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (Amended) on Complaint As to Revlon Mayeste Filed
Date: 2013-05-24T00:00:00Request Re: Stay of Execution (UD - Possession) Filed for Revlon Mayeste
Date: July 03, 2013Release of Funds Issued and Filed
Date: July 11, 2013Declaration of Robin Marshall of Opposition to Stay of Execution Filed
Date: July 09, 2013Application Re: Stay of Execution (UD - Possession) Conditionally Granted
Date: July 05, 2013Request Re: Stay of Execution (UD - Possession) Conditionally Granted
Date: July 03, 2013Application Re: Stay of Execution (UD - Possession) Filed for Revlon Mayeste
Date: July 05, 2013Writ of Possession - Unsatisfied Filed
Date: July 29, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.