Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cach, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Wilson, Ann W, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Michael E. Ballachey presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management138 days |
|
Filing DateApril 11, 2013 |
CategoryCollections |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions112 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time148 days |
Association of Attorneys Filed
Date: August 27, 2013Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Rejected
Date: August 09, 2013Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: August 27, 2013Proof of Service on Complaint As to Ann W Wilson Filed
Date: 2013-05-13T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: September 06, 2013Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 08/27/2013 09:00 AM D- 18
Date: August 05, 2013Declaration re: Venue Filed
Date: 2013-04-11T00:00:00Not Found or Non Service Return Filed
Date: 2013-05-13T00:00:00Complaint - Collections Filed
Date: 2013-04-11T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: August 26, 2013Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: August 27, 2013Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) As To Ann W Wilson Filed
Date: 2013-08-01T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 08/27/2013 03:30 PM D- 18
Date: 2013-04-17T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2013-04-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Cach, LLC Filed
Date: 2013-07-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Cach, LLC
Date: 2013-04-11T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2013-04-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.