Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Wesson, Rick, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2013 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions58 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time133 days |
Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed
Date: 2013-01-09T00:00:00Application Re: Posting Summons and Complaint Filed for Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Date: 2013-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued
Date: 2013-01-11T00:00:00Application Re: Posting Summons and Complaint Granted
Date: February 07, 2013Proof of Service on all un-named tenants/occupants Filed
Date: March 08, 2013Proof of Service on Complaint As to Rick Wesson Filed
Date: March 08, 2013Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Date: 2013-01-09T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2013-01-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: March 20, 2013Default Judgment: Clerk's UD (CCP 1169) Entered
Date: March 08, 2013Writ of Possession - Satisfied Filed
Date: May 22, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.