Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Farmers Insurance Exchange, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Masterpiece Painting, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Lawrence John Appel presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management137 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2013 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions285 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time760 days |
Association of Attorneys Filed
Date: 2013-05-20T00:00:00Declaration of Non-Service Filed
Date: 2013-01-16T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Denied
Date: 2013-04-26T00:00:00Association of Attorneys Filed
Date: 2013-08-19T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 05/20/2013 09:00 AM D- 16
Date: 2013-01-07T00:00:00Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed
Date: 2013-01-03T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: 2013-04-24T00:00:00Not Found or Non Service Return Filed
Date: 2013-04-05T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-08-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Farmers Insurance Exchange Filed
Date: September 25, 2013Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2013-01-07T00:00:00Not Found or Non Service Return Filed
Date: 2013-06-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Farmers Insurance Exchange Filed
Date: 2013-04-24T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Masterpiece Painting, Inc. Filed
Date: 2013-07-23T00:00:00Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Masterpiece Painting, Inc. Filed
Date: September 16, 2013Judgment Entered
Date: October 15, 2013Not Found or Non Service Return Filed
Date: 2013-06-12T00:00:00Proposed Order Received
Date: September 25, 2013Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2013-08-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Farmers Insurance Exchange Filed
Date: 2013-08-08T00:00:00Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed
Date: February 02, 2015Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Farmers Insurance Exchange
Date: 2013-01-03T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2013-01-03T00:00:00Notice of of CMC Filed
Date: August 23, 2013Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-05-20T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2013-05-20T00:00:00Rejection Letter Issued on Other Ex Parte
Date: 2013-04-15T00:00:00Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Filed
Date: September 25, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.