Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Hughes, William R, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2013 |
CategoryCollections |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time239 days |
Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: August 30, 2013Not Found or Non Service Return Filed
Date: February 05, 2013Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Discover Bank
Date: January 03, 2013Complaint - Collections Filed
Date: January 03, 2013Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: January 03, 2013Compliance Hearing 09/18/2013 09:01 AM D- 31
Date: July 08, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.