Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cach, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Chang, Yuming, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2013 |
CategoryCollections |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time148 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Cach, LLC
Date: January 03, 2013Not Found or Non Service Return Filed
Date: April 12, 2013Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: January 03, 2013Complaint - Collections Filed
Date: January 03, 2013Not Found or Non Service Return Filed
Date: February 25, 2013Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: May 31, 2013Proof of Service on Complaint As to Yuming Chang Filed
Date: January 17, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.