Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
John Stewart Company, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Glenns, Bennielee Toronto, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2013 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions47 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time82 days |
Application Re: Posting Summons and Complaint Denied
Date: 2013-01-15T00:00:00Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed
Date: 2013-01-03T00:00:00Application Re: Posting Summons and Complaint Filed for John Stewart Company
Date: 2013-01-14T00:00:00Application Re: Posting Summons and Complaint Filed for John Stewart Company
Date: January 24, 2013Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued
Date: 2013-01-04T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2013-01-03T00:00:00Application Re: Posting Summons and Complaint Granted
Date: January 28, 2013Proof of Service on Complaint As to Bennielee Toronto Glenns Filed
Date: February 19, 2013Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for John Stewart Company
Date: 2013-01-03T00:00:00Proof of Service on all un-named tenants/occupants Filed
Date: February 19, 2013Writ of Possession - Satisfied Filed
Date: March 26, 2013Default Judgment: Clerk's UD (CCP 1169) Entered
Date: February 19, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.