Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Leonard , Christine, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Leonard , Christine, Webb, Synedra, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Frank Roesch presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2013 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions26 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time447 days |
Default Judgment: Clerk's UD (CCP 1169) Entered
Date: 2013-01-29T00:00:00Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed
Date: 2013-01-03T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2013-01-03T00:00:00Motion to Vacate/Set Aside Default and Default Judgment Filed for Debtor
Date: 2013-03-07T00:00:00Notice to Reporter for Estimated Cost of Transcript Filed
Date: 2013-03-20T00:00:00Reply Brief of Synedra Webb Filed
Date: July 01, 2013Motion to Vacate/Set Aside Default and Default Judgment - Motion Rescheduled
Date: 2013-03-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Christine Leonard
Date: 2013-01-03T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default as to all un-named tenants/occupants Filed and Entered
Date: 2013-01-22T00:00:00Proof of Service on all un-named tenants/occupants Filed
Date: 2013-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued
Date: 2013-01-04T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed
Date: 2013-03-06T00:00:00Application Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Evelio Grillo Filed for Christine Leonard
Date: 2013-02-26T00:00:00Notice of of Bankruptcy Filed
Date: 2013-02-06T00:00:00Motion to Vacate/Set Aside Default and Default Judgment Denied
Date: 2013-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Hearing Issued
Date: July 03, 2013Request Re: Set Aside Default Judgment As To Synedra Webb
Date: 2013-02-26T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2013-03-07T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-02-27T00:00:00Application Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Evelio Grillo Granted
Date: 2013-02-26T00:00:00Notice of Appeal Filed by Synedra Webb
Date: 2013-03-12T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Synedra Webb Filed
Date: 2013-01-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply Filed
Date: 2013-03-07T00:00:00Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's UD Judgment (CCP 1169) As To Synedra Webb Filed
Date: 2013-01-29T00:00:00Designation of Clerk's Transcript on Appeal Filed by Synedra Webb
Date: 2013-03-20T00:00:00Notification of Filing Notice of Appeal Issued
Date: 2013-03-14T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Continued
Date: 2013-02-27T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-03-08T00:00:00Appellate Minute Order
Date: February 20, 2014Certified Record on Appeal Filed
Date: 2013-04-08T00:00:00Application Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Frank Roesch Denied
Date: 2013-04-24T00:00:00Notice to Parties re Reporter's Estimate Filed
Date: 2013-03-25T00:00:00Appellate Minute Order
Date: February 18, 2014Designation of Reporter's Transcript on Appeal Filed by Synedra Webb
Date: 2013-03-20T00:00:00Returned Mail: Minute Order Filed
Date: March 26, 2014Record on Appeal Received by Appellate Division
Date: 2013-04-10T00:00:00Opening Brief Filed by Synedra Webb
Date: May 09, 2013Briefing Schedule Issued
Date: 2013-04-09T00:00:00Application Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Frank Roesch Filed for Synedra Webb
Date: 2013-04-17T00:00:00Writ of Possession - Satisfied Filed
Date: May 03, 2013Reply Brief of Christine Leonard Filed
Date: June 07, 2013Reporter's Waiver of Deposit Filed
Date: 2013-03-22T00:00:00Remittitur Filed
Date: March 21, 2014Notice re Oral Argument Filed
Date: January 09, 2014Proof of Service on Motion
Date: 2013-04-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.