Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Dang , John W., filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Nivron, Natalie T., in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with C. Don Clay presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2013 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Cycle Time196 days |
At-Issue Memorandum Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2013-01-11T00:00:00Declaration Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Evelio Grillo Filed for John W. Dang
Date: 2013-03-01T00:00:00Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed
Date: 2013-01-03T00:00:00Order to Transfer/Reclassify Case Jurisdiction Filed
Date: 2013-01-14T00:00:00Memo to Set - Counter Filed for Defendant
Date: 2013-01-23T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-02-19T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Motion) Filed for Defendant
Date: 2013-03-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for John W. Dang
Date: 2013-01-03T00:00:00Master Jury Trial 02/22/2013 08:45 AM D- 1
Date: 2013-01-24T00:00:00Unlawful Detainer Court Trial Hearing Dropped from dept: 109 date: 02/21/2013 time: 09:00 AM
Date: 2013-01-24T00:00:00Application Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for Natalie T. Nivron
Date: 2013-02-15T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Natalie T. Nivron
Date: 2013-01-08T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2013-01-03T00:00:00Application Re: Continuance of Trial Date Granted
Date: 2013-02-19T00:00:00Notice of of Limited Scope Representation Filed
Date: 2013-03-06T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Unlawful Detainer Court Trial 02/21/2013 09:00 AM D- 109
Date: 2013-01-14T00:00:00Declaration Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Evelio Grillo Granted
Date: 2013-03-04T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2013-03-06T00:00:00Notice of of Limited Scope Representation Filed
Date: 2013-02-15T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: July 18, 2013Hearing Reset to Master Jury Trial 03/15/2013 08:45 AM D- 1
Date: 2013-02-19T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Motion) - Motion Rescheduled
Date: 2013-03-06T00:00:00Master Jury Trial Called and Completed
Date: March 15, 2013Substitution of Attorney Filed for Natalie T. Nivron
Date: March 22, 2013Complaint Unlawful Detainer Dismissed
Date: July 18, 2013Notice of Representation of Respondent Filed for Natalie T. Nivron
Date: March 15, 2013Request for Stipulation Filed for Plaintiff
Date: March 15, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.