Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of America, N.., filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Marsot, Benoit, Marsot , Gina, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2013 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Cycle Time70 days |
Application Re: Posting Summons and Complaint Denied
Date: January 15, 2013Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed
Date: January 03, 2013Application Re: Posting Summons and Complaint Granted
Date: January 29, 2013Application Re: Posting Summons and Complaint Filed for Bank of America, N..
Date: January 14, 2013Returned Mail: Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Filed
Date: January 15, 2013Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Bank of America
Date: January 03, 2013Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: March 14, 2013Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued
Date: January 04, 2013Application Re: Posting Summons and Complaint Filed for Bank of America, N..
Date: January 29, 2013Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2013-01-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.