Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Environmental Research Center, filed a(n) Other Complaint case against Advocare International, L.P., in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Gail Brewster Bereola presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management137 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2013 |
CategoryOther Complaint |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions421 days |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time427 days |
Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 12/20/2013 09:00 AM D- 19
Date: 2013-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2013-01-04T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Advocare International, L.P. Filed
Date: 2013-03-26T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Advocare International, L.P.
Date: 2013-05-01T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed for Environmental Research Center
Date: October 30, 2013Judgment Entered
Date: February 28, 2014Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 05/20/2013 09:00 AM D- 19
Date: 2013-01-22T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2013-08-23T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-07-19T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2013-07-19T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: February 27, 2014Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Environmental Research Center
Date: 2013-01-03T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 05/20/2013 09:00 AM D- 15
Date: 2013-01-04T00:00:00Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement Filed for Plaintiff
Date: December 26, 2013Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2013-01-03T00:00:00Complaint - Other Filed
Date: 2013-01-03T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-05-20T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2013-05-20T00:00:00Request Re: Continuance of Hearing Filed for Environmental Research Center
Date: 2013-10-07T00:00:00Request Re: Continuance of Hearing Granted
Date: 2013-10-09T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 03/21/2014 09:00 AM D- 19
Date: November 13, 2013Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement Granted
Date: February 27, 2014Judgment Entire Action Filed
Date: February 28, 2014Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-08-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.