Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Berger, David L. Md, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case against Dryden, Kirk P., Kirk P. Dryden Insurance And Financial Services, Inc., Minnesota Mutual Life Insurance Company, The Standard Insurance Co., in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Robert B. Freedman presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management136 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2012 |
CategoryInsurance Coverage |
Time To Trial136 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
|
Case Cycle Time303 days |
Proof of Service on Complaint As to Kirk P. Dryden Filed
Date: 2012-03-07T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Kirk P. Dryden Insurance and Financial Services, Inc. Filed
Date: 2012-02-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement of David L. Berger MD Filed
Date: 2012-05-30T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Protective Orders Filed for The Standard Insurance Co.
Date: 2012-08-02T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2012-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed
Date: October 23, 2012Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: November 28, 2012Answer to Complaint Filed for The Standard Insurance Co.
Date: 2012-02-29T00:00:00Order Confidentiality agreement and Protective Order Filed
Date: August 06, 2012Notice of Settlement Filed for David L. Berger MD
Date: October 25, 2012Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2012-01-30T00:00:00Compliance Hearing 12/28/2012 10:00 AM D- 20
Date: October 25, 2012Case Management Statement of Kirk P. Dryden, Kirk P. Dryden Insurance and Financial Services, Inc. F
Date: 2012-05-30T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Filed
Date: 2012-03-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for David L. Berger MD
Date: 2012-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2012-01-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement of The Standard Insurance Co. Filed
Date: 2012-05-29T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Kirk P. Dryden Insurance and Financial Services, Inc. Filed
Date: 2012-03-07T00:00:00Miscellaneous Attendance Sheet Filed
Date: 2012-06-14T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2012-06-14T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 06/14/2012 02:00 PM D- 20
Date: 2012-01-31T00:00:00Complaint - Insurance Coverage Filed
Date: 2012-01-30T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Minnesota Mutual Life Insurance Company
Date: 2012-03-01T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Kirk P. Dryden Filed
Date: 2012-02-17T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Protective Orders Granted
Date: August 03, 2012Answer to Complaint Filed for Kirk P. Dryden Insurance and Financial Services, Inc., Kirk P. Dryden
Date: 2012-03-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.