Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cambridge Place Association, filed a(n) Other Complaint case against Carbajal, Armando, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Delbert C. Gee presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management129 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2012 |
CategoryOther Complaint |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time207 days |
Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2012-01-31T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 06/07/2012 08:30 AM D- 510
Date: 2012-04-18T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2012-05-24T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: July 16, 2012Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Cambridge Place Association
Date: 2012-05-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Cambridge Place Association
Date: 2012-01-30T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2012-01-30T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 06/13/2012 08:30 AM D- 510
Date: 2012-01-31T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2012-05-24T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: June 07, 2012Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed
Date: August 24, 2012Complaint - Other Filed
Date: 2012-01-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Cambridge Place Association Filed
Date: July 02, 2012Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2012-06-07T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: July 16, 2012For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.