Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Katz, Helisa, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Taruskin, Richard, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Kimberly E. Colwell presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management139 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2012 |
CategoryAuto Tort |
Time To Trial163 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time539 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Helisa Katz
Date: 2012-01-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Richard Taruskin Filed
Date: 2012-05-15T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed for Helisa Katz
Date: June 14, 2013Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-01-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Helisa Katz Filed
Date: 2013-06-07T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2013-01-24T00:00:00Case Management Conf Continuance 06/17/2013 02:30 PM D- 516
Date: 2013-05-30T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: June 11, 2013Settlement Conference Statement of Helisa Katz Filed
Date: 2013-05-22T00:00:00Compliance Hearing 08/27/2013 03:00 PM D- 516
Date: June 17, 2013Judge's Memo to Clerk: Settlement Conference
Date: 2013-05-29T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 05/31/2012 02:30 PM D- 516
Date: 2012-01-26T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2012-01-17T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2012-01-26T00:00:00Complaint - Auto Tort Filed
Date: 2012-01-17T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2012-06-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Richard Taruskin Filed
Date: June 14, 2013Settlement Conference Statement of Richard Taruskin Filed
Date: 2013-05-23T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2012-06-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Helisa Katz Filed
Date: 2012-05-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Helisa Katz Filed
Date: 2012-06-19T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Richard Taruskin
Date: 2012-04-12T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 06/14/2012 02:30 PM D- 516
Date: 2012-05-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Richard Taruskin Filed
Date: 2013-01-10T00:00:00Case Management Conference Filed
Date: June 14, 2013Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-05-29T00:00:00Order Issues/Pretrial Conference Filed
Date: 2013-05-01T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: July 09, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.