Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Martin, Karen, Toliver, Tamiya, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Terrell, Reginald V, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with David Hunter presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management135 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2012 |
CategoryAuto Tort |
Time To Trial135 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time539 days |
Notice of Change of Lead Attorney Filed for Reginald V Terrell
Date: 2012-04-03T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2012-05-31T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 05/31/2012 09:00 AM D- 520
Date: 2012-01-18T00:00:00Case Management Conf Continuance 05/31/2013 09:30 AM D- 520
Date: 2012-09-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Karen Martin, Tamiya Toliver Filed
Date: 2012-05-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Reginald V Terrell Filed
Date: 2012-05-14T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2012-05-31T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Reginald V Terrell
Date: 2012-03-09T00:00:00Complaint - Auto Tort Filed
Date: 2012-01-17T00:00:00Notice of Proposed Arbitrators Issued
Date: 2012-06-05T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2012-01-17T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Civil Jury Trial 06/10/2013 10:00 AM D- 15
Date: January 31, 2013Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Karen Martin
Date: 2012-01-17T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 05/31/2013 09:30 AM D- 15
Date: January 28, 2013Notice of Assignment of Arbitrator Issued
Date: 2012-06-18T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2012-01-18T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Reginald V Terrell Filed
Date: 2012-03-01T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: July 09, 2013Notice of Unavailability of Counsel Filed
Date: January 07, 2013Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: May 28, 2013Rejection of Arbitrator Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2012-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Filed
Date: 2012-06-08T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Civil Jury Trial 06/10/2013 10:00 AM D- 520
Date: 2012-09-05T00:00:00Conditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385)
Date: May 20, 2013Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2012-08-13T00:00:00Order Resetting Civil Case for Trial Filed
Date: 2012-09-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.