Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Legal One Property Management, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Flores, Josefina, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Richard O. Keller presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard O. Keller Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 26, 2011 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Time To Trial42 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time46 days |
Master Jury Trial Called and Completed
Date: October 07, 2011Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2011-08-26T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Josefina Flores
Date: 2011-09-06T00:00:00Request Re: Judgment Pursuant to Stipulation Filed for Plaintiff
Date: October 11, 2011Amended Answer to Complaint Filed for Josefina Flores
Date: 2011-09-15T00:00:00Memo to Set - Counter Filed for Defendant
Date: 2011-09-22T00:00:00Memo To Set Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2011-09-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Legal One Property Management
Date: 2011-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued
Date: 2011-08-30T00:00:00Unlawful Detainer Court Trial 09/29/2011 09:00 AM D- 110
Date: 2011-09-12T00:00:00Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed
Date: 2011-08-26T00:00:00Master Jury Trial 10/07/2011 08:45 AM D- 1
Date: September 23, 2011Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Completed
Date: October 11, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.