Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Aspire Public Schools, Butler, Ashton, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Aspire Public Schools, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeYvonne Gonzalez Rogers Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management137 days |
Filing DateJune 09, 2011 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Tort |
Time To Trial137 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time349 days |
Petition Re: Other Ex Parte Denied
Date: May 04, 2012Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Granted
Date: 2012-02-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Monita Jones Filed
Date: 2012-04-03T00:00:00Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Granted
Date: 2011-06-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Ashton Butler Filed
Date: 2011-09-30T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2011-10-24T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Aspire Public Schools
Date: 2011-06-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Ashton Butler Filed
Date: 2012-03-26T00:00:00Petition Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: April 17, 2012Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Ashton Butler
Date: 2011-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2011-12-13T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: May 23, 2012Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: May 21, 2012Case Management Statement of Monita Jones Filed
Date: 2012-01-25T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2011-12-05T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2012-02-17T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Monita Jones
Date: 2012-01-25T00:00:00Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed
Date: 2011-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed for Ashton Butler
Date: April 12, 2012Case Management Statement of Aspire Public Schools Filed
Date: 2012-02-14T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2011-06-17T00:00:00Petition Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: May 04, 2012Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Antoine Towers Jr.
Date: 2012-02-15T00:00:00Order Compromise of Minor's Claim Filed
Date: May 04, 2012Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2011-10-24T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed for Aspire Public Schools
Date: 2011-12-05T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Aspire Public Schools Filed
Date: 2011-06-22T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 10/24/2011 09:00 AM D- 24
Date: 2011-06-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Aspire Public Schools Filed
Date: 2011-10-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Ashton Butler
Date: 2011-06-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Aspire Public Schools Filed
Date: 2012-03-29T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 06/29/2012 09:01 AM D- 24
Date: April 12, 2012Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2011-06-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Ashton Butler Filed
Date: 2012-02-02T00:00:00Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Antoine Towers
Date: 2012-01-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.