Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Jasbir Singh Kalsi, Karenjit Kaur Kalsi, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Anthony Clarke, Cielo Entertainment,Llc,A California Limited Liability Company, Cielo Music Group, Inc.,A California Corporation, Heike Miller, Jennie Z. Meehan, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts Superior with Dennis W. Hayashi presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management138 days |
|
Filing DateJune 09, 2011 |
CategoryFraud |
Time To Trial880 days |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions140 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time1128 days |
Proof of Service on Complaint As to Anthony Clarke Filed
Date: August 24, 2011Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: June 09, 2011Proof of Service on Complaint As to Heike Miller Filed
Date: August 24, 2011Proof of Service on Complaint As to Heike Miller Filed
Date: September 04, 2013Proof of Service on Complaint As to Anthony Clarke Filed
Date: September 05, 2013Complaint Fraud Filed
Date: June 09, 2011Initial Case Management Conference 10/25/2011 02:30 PM D- 608
Date: 2011-06-10T00:00:00Complaint Fraud Filed
Date: 2011-06-09T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2011-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2011-06-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Jasbir Singh Kalsi
Date: 2011-06-09T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Heike Miller Filed
Date: 2011-08-24T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Cielo Music Group, Inc.,a California Corporation Filed
Date: 2011-08-05T00:00:00Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Cielo Music Group, Inc.,a California Corporation Filed
Date: 2011-10-04T00:00:00Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Anthony Clarke Filed
Date: 2011-10-04T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 10/25/2011 02:30 PM D- 522
Date: 2011-09-08T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Cielo Entertainment,LLC,a California limited liability company
Date: 2011-08-05T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Anthony Clarke Filed
Date: 2011-08-24T00:00:00Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Heike Miller Filed
Date: 2011-10-04T00:00:00Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Cielo Entertainment,LLC,a California limited liability comp
Date: 2011-10-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for Karenjit Kaur Kalsi
Date: 2012-05-10T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2012-10-01T00:00:00Rejection Letter Issued on Default Court Judgment (CCP 585)
Date: 2012-01-06T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2012-12-07T00:00:00Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Filed and Entered
Date: 2012-01-11T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Jennie Z. Meehan Filed
Date: 2011-10-25T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2012-07-10T00:00:00Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Filed
Date: 2012-12-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Jasbir Singh Kalsi, Karenjit Kaur Kalsi Filed
Date: 2013-03-27T00:00:00Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Filed
Date: 2013-05-17T00:00:00Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Filed
Date: 2012-12-05T00:00:00Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Rejected
Date: 2012-03-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for Karenjit Kaur Kalsi
Date: 2011-10-25T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2012-07-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Jasbir Singh Kalsi, Karenjit Kaur Kalsi Filed
Date: 2011-10-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for Jasbir Singh Kalsi
Date: 2012-05-10T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2012-03-15T00:00:00Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Rejected
Date: 2013-06-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for Jasbir Singh Kalsi
Date: 2012-10-15T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2012-10-01T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2011-10-25T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2012-03-15T00:00:00Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Rejected
Date: 2013-01-28T00:00:00Response to OSC Filed
Date: 2012-12-05T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-03-26T00:00:00Civil Uncontested 11/05/2013 02:30 PM D- 522
Date: 2013-07-19T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-07-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for Karenjit Kaur Kalsi
Date: 2012-10-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for Karenjit Kaur Kalsi
Date: 2011-10-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for Jasbir Singh Kalsi
Date: 2011-10-25T00:00:00Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Filed
Date: 2012-01-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Jasbir Singh Kalsi, Karenjit Kaur Kalsi Filed
Date: 2013-03-25T00:00:00Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Filed
Date: 2013-05-13T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2012-12-07T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2011-10-25T00:00:00Rejection Letter Issued on Default Court Judgment (CCP 585)
Date: 2013-05-15T00:00:00Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Filed
Date: 2013-05-20T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2012-01-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Jasbir Singh Kalsi, Karenjit Kaur Kalsi Filed
Date: 2012-10-09T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2013-03-26T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2013-07-19T00:00:00Rejection Letter Issued on Entry of Default as to Party
Date: 2013-10-29T00:00:00Rejection Letter Issued on Default Court Judgment (CCP 585)
Date: 2013-11-06T00:00:00Rejection Letter Issued on Default Court Judgment (CCP 585)
Date: 2013-10-18T00:00:00Judgment Entered
Date: 2013-11-05T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: 2014-06-13T00:00:00Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Anthony Clarke Filed
Date: 2013-11-01T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Anthony Clarke Filed
Date: 2013-09-05T00:00:00Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Heike Miller Filed
Date: 2013-11-01T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Heike Miller Filed
Date: 2013-09-04T00:00:00Civil Uncontested Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-11-05T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Rejected
Date: 2014-06-17T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed
Date: 2013-12-09T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Granted
Date: 2014-07-11T00:00:00Proposed Judgment Filed
Date: 2013-11-08T00:00:00Rejection Letter Issued on Writ of Execution
Date: 2013-11-25T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: 2014-07-10T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling Published for 08/10/2023 2:30 PM Hearing on Motion to Vacate Judgment} Tentative Ruling |
|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Appearance Filed by: Heike Miller (Defendant) Document |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reply Supplemental Reply Memorandum of Points And Authorities of Defendant Heike Fuchs In Support of Motion To Vacate Judgment Filed by: Heike Miller (Defendant) Document |
|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECLARATION OF S. PATRICK MILLER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT HEIKE FUCHS' MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT Filed by: Jasbir Singh Kalsi (Plaintiff) Document |
|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by: Sean Patrick Miller (Attorney) Document |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Address for Sean Patrick Miller (Attorney) customer request Party |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Updated -- Sean Patrick Miller (Attorney):First Name changed from Olumide to SeanLast Name changed from Obayemi to MillerOrganization Name changed from Law Offices of Olumide K Obayemi to Stuhr & Miller, LLPMiddle Name: Patrick Party |
|
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL Order re: Hearing on Motion to Vacate Judgment Filed by: Clerk As to: Anthony Clarke (Defendant) Document |
|
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL Order re: Hearing on Motion to Vacate Judgment Filed by: Clerk As to: Heike Miller (Defendant) Document |
|
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL Order re: Hearing on Motion to Vacate Judgment Filed by: Clerk As to: Jennie Z. Meehan (Defendant) Document |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.