Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Dizon, Louie H., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Pasam, Venkat, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeYvonne Gonzalez Rogers Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management139 days |
Filing DateApril 21, 2011 |
CategoryAuto Tort |
Time To Trial139 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time385 days |
Case Management Statement of Venkat Pasam Filed
Date: 2012-03-23T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: April 26, 2012Release of Funds Issued and Filed
Date: May 10, 2012Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2012-03-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Venkat Pasam Filed
Date: 2011-12-22T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2012-02-23T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Venkat Pasam Filed
Date: 2011-06-14T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: April 04, 2012Case Management Statement of Louie H. Dizon Filed
Date: 2011-08-17T00:00:00Complaint - Auto Tort Filed
Date: 2011-04-21T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2011-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2011-04-26T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Venkat Pasam
Date: 2011-07-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Venkat Pasam Filed
Date: 2011-08-23T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2011-12-12T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Louie H. Dizon
Date: 2011-04-21T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2011-09-07T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 09/07/2011 09:00 AM D- 24
Date: 2011-04-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Louie H. Dizon Filed
Date: 2011-11-28T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2011-09-07T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: April 05, 2012Case Management Statement of Louie H. Dizon Filed
Date: 2012-02-16T00:00:00Application Re: Continuance of Case Management Conference Filed for Louie H. Dizon
Date: 2011-12-12T00:00:00Notice of Change of Name and Address Filed
Date: 2012-02-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Louie H. Dizon Filed
Date: March 26, 2012Case Management Statement of Venkat Pasam Filed
Date: 2012-02-10T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2011-04-21T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed for Louie H. Dizon
Date: April 09, 2012For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.