Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Allan S Kuperstein, Kuperstein, Allan S, The Joseph Zatkin Family Trust And Zatkin Assoicates, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Brad Peterson, Peterson, Brad, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Gail Brewster Bereola presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2011 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions145 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time383 days |
Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed
Date: January 12, 2011Civil Order of Examination Issued
Date: August 16, 2011OEX - Sworn, Examined, and Ordered Discharged
Date: September 30, 2011Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Allan S Kuperstein
Date: January 12, 2011Writ of Execution - Unsatisfied from San Mateo Filed
Date: January 30, 2012OEX - Sworn and Ordered Discharged
Date: September 30, 2011Order of Examination 09/30/2011 10:00 AM D- 19
Date: August 16, 2011Initial Case Management Conference 05/27/2011 09:00 AM D- 19
Date: January 13, 2011Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: January 12, 2011Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: January 13, 2011Proof of Service on Complaint As to Brad Peterson Filed
Date: January 24, 2011Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Filed
Date: April 07, 2011Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Brad Peterson Filed
Date: February 23, 2011Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: Does Request all does
Date: April 07, 2011Proposed Judgment Request
Date: April 07, 2011Declaration in Support of Attorney Fees Request
Date: April 07, 2011Declaration Other: Request
Date: April 07, 2011Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 06/13/2011 09:00 AM D- 19
Date: February 28, 2011Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: April 07, 2011Declaration Request
Date: April 07, 2011Judgment Entered
Date: June 06, 2011Proof of Service on Order of Examination Filed
Date: August 25, 2011Judgment Entered
Date: 2011-06-06T00:00:00Proof of Service on Order of Examination Filed
Date: August 25, 2011OEX - Sworn, Examined, and Ordered Discharged
Date: September 30, 2011Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Brad Peterson Filed
Date: 2011-02-23T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Brad Peterson Filed
Date: 2011-01-24T00:00:00Writ of Execution - Unsatisfied from San Mateo Filed
Date: January 30, 2012Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Filed
Date: 2011-04-07T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2011-01-12T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Allan S Kuperstein
Date: 2011-01-12T00:00:00OEX - Sworn and Ordered Discharged
Date: September 30, 2011Initial Case Management Conference 05/27/2011 09:00 AM D- 19
Date: 2011-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2011-01-13T00:00:00Civil Order of Examination Issued
Date: 2011-08-16T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 06/13/2011 09:00 AM D- 19
Date: 2011-02-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2011-04-07T00:00:00Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed
Date: 2011-01-12T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.