Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kermani, Sina Saffari, White, Jerrold Bruce, Parrilla, Louis Carmelo Sr, Parrilla, Teresa D, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Kermani, Sina Saffari, White, Jerrold Bruce, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with David Hunter presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management136 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 11, 2009 |
CategoryAuto Tort |
Time To Trial136 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time650 days |
Proof of Service on Complaint As to Jerrold Bruce White Filed
Date: 2009-10-28T00:00:00Summons on Cross Complaint Issued
Date: 2009-11-17T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed
Date: 2009-12-18T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2009-09-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Louis Carmelo Parrilla SR
Date: 2009-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2009-09-15T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 01/25/2010 09:00 AM D- 520
Date: 2009-09-15T00:00:00Complaint - Auto Tort Filed
Date: 2009-09-11T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Jerrold Bruce White
Date: 2009-11-17T00:00:00Proof of Service on Cross-Complaint As to Sina Saffari Kermani Filed
Date: 2010-01-07T00:00:00Settlement Conference Statement of Teresa D Parrilla Filed
Date: 2010-10-06T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed for Sina Saffari Kermani
Date: 2010-01-21T00:00:00Miscellaneous re: updated attorney compliance statement Filed
Date: 2010-12-15T00:00:00Statement Attorney Compliance Statement Filed
Date: 2010-11-23T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Sina Saffari Kermani Filed
Date: 2010-01-13T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Sina Saffari Kermani
Date: 2010-01-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Jerrold Bruce White Filed
Date: 2010-06-08T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2010-01-25T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Filed
Date: May 24, 2011Notice of Settlement Filed for Louis Carmelo Parrilla SR, Teresa D Parrilla
Date: 2010-10-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Louis Carmelo Parrilla SR, Teresa D Parrilla Filed
Date: 2010-01-04T00:00:00Settlement Conference Statement of Teresa D Parrilla Filed
Date: 2010-10-05T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: June 07, 2011Case Management Statement of Sina Saffari Kermani Filed
Date: 2010-01-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Jerrold Bruce White Filed
Date: 2010-01-04T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Sina Saffari Kermani
Date: 2010-01-21T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2010-01-25T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Jerrold Bruce White
Date: 2010-01-29T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2010-06-09T00:00:00Statement Update Attorney Compliance Statement Filed
Date: 2011-02-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Louis Carmelo Parrilla SR, Teresa D Parrilla Filed
Date: 2010-05-12T00:00:00Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2010-10-08T00:00:00Rejection Letter Issued on Dismissal with prejudice - entire action
Date: 2011-05-12T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2010-11-29T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2010-11-29T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2010-12-14T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: June 07, 2011Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2010-12-14T00:00:00Notice of intent to appear by telephone Filed
Date: 2010-12-15T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed
Date: 2011-05-19T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2011-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: June 22, 2011Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2011-03-01T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Filed
Date: June 07, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.