Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Mccurn, Sharon, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Jo-Lynne Q. Lee presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management139 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryCollections |
Time To Trial182 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions303 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time484 days |
Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2009-05-19T00:00:00Proposed Judgment Filed
Date: 2009-09-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Sharon McCurn Filed
Date: 2009-05-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed for Capital One Bank (USA) N.A.
Date: 2009-09-24T00:00:00Amended Answer to Complaint Filed for Sharon McCurn
Date: 2009-05-01T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Sharon McCurn Filed
Date: 2009-01-27T00:00:00Motion to Amend Complaint Filed by Capital One Bank
Date: 2009-04-29T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration in Support Filed
Date: 2009-09-24T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Sharon McCurn
Date: 2009-02-02T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2009-05-19T00:00:00Motion to Amend Complaint Granted
Date: 2009-07-01T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 05/19/2009 03:00 PM D- 22
Date: 2009-02-03T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2009-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: 2009-07-21T00:00:00Declaration of Attorney in Support of Attorney's Fees Filed
Date: 2009-09-24T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2009-07-01T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2009-07-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Capital One Bank
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2009-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Mediator Selection Filed
Date: 2009-08-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Capital One Bank Filed
Date: 2009-04-30T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2009-09-09T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed
Date: 2009-09-24T00:00:00Declaration : Affidavit of Venue Filed
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: 2009-07-09T00:00:00Miscellaneous CCP 96 Witness and Evidence Request Filed
Date: 2009-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2009-09-24T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2009-07-21T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Using of Photocopy of Plaintiff Dec. Filed
Date: 2009-09-09T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Complaint - Collections Filed (Amended)
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Notice of Requesting and Requiring Parties to Attend Trial CCP Sec. 1987(b) Filed
Date: 2009-09-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Capital One Bank Filed
Date: 2009-06-17T00:00:00Proposed Order Filed
Date: 2009-09-24T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2009-07-01T00:00:00Proposed Amended Pleading Received
Date: 2009-04-29T00:00:00Judgment Entered
Date: October 30, 2009Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Completed
Date: October 30, 2009Declaration Filed
Date: 2009-10-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous : Supplemental Declaration in Support of Interest Filed
Date: October 30, 2009Trial Brief - Defendant Filed
Date: 2009-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed
Date: October 30, 2009Proposed Judgment Received
Date: 2009-10-30T00:00:00Memo of credits interest & costs after judgment Filed for Capital One Bank (USA) N.A.
Date: December 24, 2009Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2009-10-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2009-10-30T00:00:00Writ of Execution - Unsatisfied from San Francisco Filed
Date: April 29, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.