Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Far East National Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Aguilar, Alejandro M., Aguilar, Angelica, Club Mangos, Inc., A California Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with George C. Hernandez, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management161 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time405 days |
Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: January 25, 2010Motion to Confirm Appointment of Receiver Granted
Date: January 19, 2010Initial Case Management Conference 05/18/2009 02:30 PM D- 607
Date: 2009-01-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous Interim report of receiver Filed
Date: 2009-06-17T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2009-08-24T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: November 04, 2009Case Management Statement of Far East National Bank Filed
Date: 2009-08-10T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: January 19, 2010Report of Receiver (Interim) Filed
Date: 2009-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 09, 2010Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2009-03-06T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2009-01-02T00:00:00Oath of Receiver Filed
Date: 2009-02-10T00:00:00Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Alejandro M. Aguilar Filed
Date: 2009-05-20T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Other Exparte Filed:
Date: 2009-01-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Far East National Bank
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Other Exparte Granted
Date: 2009-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2009-03-10T00:00:00Undertaking Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2009-02-10T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2009-08-24T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2009-06-10T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Declaration Re: Other Exparte Filed:
Date: 2009-10-19T00:00:00Stipulation Re: Appointment of Receiver Filed for Far East National Bank
Date: 2009-03-10T00:00:00Motion to Confirm Appointment of Receiver Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2009-10-13T00:00:00Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Club Mangos, Inc., a California corporation Filed
Date: 2009-03-06T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings Filed
Date: 2009-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Alejandro M. Aguilar Filed
Date: 2009-03-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Far East National Bank Filed
Date: 2009-10-22T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2009-11-04T00:00:00Undertaking Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2009-03-10T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2009-06-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Far East National Bank Filed
Date: 2009-05-18T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 06/10/2009 02:30 PM D- 607
Date: 2009-02-24T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Motion to Confirm receiver Filed
Date: 2009-10-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.