Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bigfix Asia Pte. Ltd, filed a(n) Unlimited Civil case against Bigfix Holdings Pte., Ltd., Bigfix , Inc., George Billman, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 30, 2008 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
Complaint Fraud Filed
Date: May 30, 2008Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Bigfix Asia PTE. LTD
Date: May 30, 2008Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: May 30, 2008Notice of Judicial Assignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: June 03, 2008Declaration in Opposition of Chong Foo Chaw
Date: July 29, 2008Declaration (reply)
Date: August 13, 2008Demurrer - Motion Rescheduled
Date: August 20, 2008Initial Case Management Conference 10/14/2008 02:30 PM D- 510
Date: June 03, 2008Declaration in Support
Date: July 02, 2008Demurrer Filed by Bigfix , Inc., Bigfix Holdings Pte., Ltd., George Billman
Date: July 02, 2008Proof of Service on Complaint As to George Billman Filed
Date: June 05, 2008Proof of Service on Complaint As to Bigfix , Inc. Filed
Date: June 04, 2008Notice of Judicial assignment for all purposes & notice of CMC & order Filed
Date: June 17, 2008Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: July 02, 2008Proposed Order
Date: July 02, 2008Proof of Service on Motion
Date: July 02, 2008Proposed Order Filed
Date: August 22, 2008Objection Filed
Date: August 15, 2008Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: August 20, 2008Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition of Demurrer Filed
Date: July 29, 2008Proof of Service by Mail on Memo of Points & Auth in Opposition to Demurrer Filed
Date: August 04, 2008Motion Filed by George Billman, Bigfix Holdings Pte., Ltd., Bigfix , Inc.
Date: July 02, 2008Declaration in Support
Date: July 02, 2008Declaration
Date: July 02, 2008Declaration in Opposition of Ardell Johnson
Date: July 29, 2008Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: July 16, 2008Stipulation and Order Re: Other Exparte Filed:
Date: July 15, 2008Stipulation and Order Re: Other Exparte Granted
Date: July 17, 2008Declaration in Support Filed
Date: August 13, 2008Declaration of Ana Maria Detine
Date: August 13, 2008Declaration of He Hin Hoong
Date: July 29, 2008Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: August 20, 2008Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: August 20, 2008Proof of Service
Date: August 13, 2008Motion Granted in Part
Date: August 20, 2008Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed
Date: September 19, 2008Reply Brief in Support of Motion Filed
Date: August 13, 2008Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: August 27, 2008Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed for Bigfix , Inc., Bigfix Holdings Pte., Ltd., George Billman
Date: September 30, 2008Motion Filed by George Billman, Bigfix Holdings Pte., Ltd., Bigfix , Inc.
Date: 2008-07-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Bigfix Asia PTE. LTD
Date: 2008-05-30T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2008-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Assignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2008-06-03T00:00:00Complaint Fraud Filed
Date: 2008-05-30T00:00:00Declaration in Support Filed
Date: 2008-08-13T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed
Date: September 19, 2008Proof of Service on Complaint As to Bigfix , Inc. Filed
Date: 2008-06-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail on Memo of Points & Auth in Opposition to Demurrer Filed
Date: 2008-08-04T00:00:00Demurrer - Motion Rescheduled
Date: 2008-08-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed for Bigfix , Inc., Bigfix Holdings Pte., Ltd., George Billman
Date: September 30, 2008Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2008-08-20T00:00:00Proposed Order Filed
Date: 2008-08-22T00:00:00Reply Brief in Support of Motion Filed
Date: 2008-08-13T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 10/14/2008 02:30 PM D- 510
Date: 2008-06-03T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Other Exparte Filed:
Date: 2008-07-15T00:00:00Motion Granted in Part
Date: 2008-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Judicial assignment for all purposes & notice of CMC & order Filed
Date: 2008-06-17T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to George Billman Filed
Date: 2008-06-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition of Demurrer Filed
Date: 2008-07-29T00:00:00Miscellaneous - Cases Cited in Opposition to Motion for Order Requiring Pltf to File an UNdertaking
Date: 2008-07-29T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2008-08-20T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Other Exparte Granted
Date: 2008-07-17T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2008-05-30T00:00:00Objection Filed
Date: 2008-08-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2008-07-16T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Motion for Order Requiring Pltf to File an Und
Date: 2008-07-29T00:00:00Demurrer Filed by Bigfix , Inc., Bigfix Holdings Pte., Ltd., George Billman
Date: 2008-07-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.