Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Edwards, Teneatha Nicole, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Davis, Willie Sr., in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryCh-100 Request For Orders To Stop Harassment (Civil Harassment) |
Last RefreshedNovember 03, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Case Cycle Time206 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2008 |
Petition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment
Judge: Jon Rantzman |
||
July 24, 2008 | Docket Event | Civil Harassment Commenced and Completed | |
July 24, 2008 | Docket Event | Petition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment Dismissed | |
January 24, 2008 |
Petition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment
Judge: Jon Rantzman |
||
January 24, 2008 | Docket Event | Reissuance of Temporary Restraining Order (Civil Harassment) Granted | |
January 24, 2008 | Docket Event | Civil Harassment 07/24/2008 02:00 PM D- 102 | |
January 24, 2008 | Docket Event | Civil Harassment Commenced and Completed | |
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on Petition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment As to Willie Davis Sr. Filed | |
January 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (Civil Harassment) Granted | |
January 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Civil Harassment 01/24/2008 02:00 PM D- 102 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.