Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
1948 East 29Th Street, Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Sander, Kimberly, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 04, 2020 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions100 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time121 days |
Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued
Date: January 02, 2008Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: December 31, 2007Proof of Service on Complaint As to Kimberly Sander Filed
Date: April 09, 2008Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for 1948 East 29th Street, LLC
Date: December 31, 2007Writ of Possession - Satisfied Filed
Date: April 30, 2008Default Judgment: Clerk's UD (CCP 1169) Entered
Date: April 09, 2008Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.