Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Velma Sonny-Sonia, filed a(n) Unlimited Civil case against Michael Joel Blumenfeld, Michael Joel Blumenfeld, Deceased, The Michael Blumenfeld Law Corporation, represented by Russell S Roeca, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Winifred Younge Smith presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 14, 2006 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: November 30, 2006Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: November 30, 2006Complaint - Professional Negligence Filed
Date: July 14, 2006Request for Judicial Notice
Date: May 16, 2007Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: May 31, 2007Separate Statement
Date: May 16, 2007Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: May 31, 2007Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: May 31, 2007Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: April 24, 2007Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: May 16, 2007Miscellaneous RE: CMC Statement Filed
Date: April 27, 2007Proof of Service on Motion
Date: May 16, 2007Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Velma Sonny-Sonia
Date: July 14, 2006Case Management Statement of Velma Sonny-Sonia Filed
Date: November 28, 2006Proof of Service on Complaint As to Michael Joel Blumenfeld Filed
Date: November 29, 2006Initial Case Management Conference 11/30/2006 09:00 AM D- 110
Date: October 10, 2006Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: July 14, 2006Proof of Service on Complaint As to The Michael Blumenfeld Law Corporation Filed
Date: November 29, 2006Proof of Service on Complaint As to Michael Joel Blumenfeld, deceased Filed
Date: November 29, 2006Notice of Order Filed
Date: October 11, 2007Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed
Date: October 18, 2007Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: November 30, 2006Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 04/24/2007 09:00 AM D- 110
Date: January 11, 2007Rejection Letter Issued on Case Management Statement
Date: April 27, 2007Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: April 24, 2007Case Management Statement of Velma Sonny-Sonia Filed
Date: April 09, 2007Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: April 24, 2007Opposition Filed
Date: August 31, 2007Proposed Order
Date: May 16, 2007Notice of Judicial Assignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: May 21, 2007Declaration in Support
Date: September 07, 2007Hearing Reset to Motion for Summary Judgment 08/22/2007 09:00 AM D- 114
Date: June 21, 2007Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 08/21/2007 09:00 AM D- 114
Date: June 21, 2007Declaration Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Judge Winifred Y. Smith Granted
Date: July 10, 2007Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 09/06/2007 09:00 AM D- 520
Date: July 18, 2007Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: July 16, 2007Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: September 14, 2007Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts In Reply
Date: September 07, 2007Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: September 14, 2007Hearing Reset to Motion for Summary Judgment 09/14/2007 09:30 AM D- 520
Date: July 18, 2007Motion for Summary Judgment Granted
Date: September 14, 2007Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 08/21/2007 09:00 AM D- 8
Date: August 13, 2007Case Management Statement of The Michael Blumenfeld Law Corporation Filed
Date: July 27, 2007Case Management Statement of Velma Sonny-Sonia Filed
Date: August 23, 2007Separate Statement Filed for Velma Sonny-Sonia
Date: August 31, 2007Request for Judicial Notice Filed for Velma Sonny-Sonia
Date: August 31, 2007Declaration in Opposition / Velma Sonny-Sonia
Date: August 31, 2007Declaration in Opposition / Matthew J. Webb Filed by Velma Sonny-Sonia
Date: August 31, 2007Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: September 06, 2007Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: September 06, 2007Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment Filed
Date: September 07, 2007Declaration
Date: September 07, 2007Exhibits Proof of Service
Date: September 07, 2007Declaration Objection to Evidence Offered In Opposition
Date: September 07, 2007Order Filed
Date: October 01, 2007Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed
Date: December 10, 2007Proof of Service on Complaint As to Michael Joel Blumenfeld, deceased Filed
Date: 2006-11-29T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 11/30/2006 09:00 AM D- 110
Date: 2006-10-10T00:00:00Declaration Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Judge Winifred Y. Smith Granted
Date: 2007-07-10T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2007-04-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Velma Sonny-Sonia
Date: 2006-07-14T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2006-11-30T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2007-04-24T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Michael Joel Blumenfeld Filed
Date: 2006-11-29T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2007-09-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement of The Michael Blumenfeld Law Corporation Filed
Date: 2007-07-27T00:00:00Opposition Filed
Date: 2007-08-31T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2006-11-30T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to The Michael Blumenfeld Law Corporation Filed
Date: 2006-11-29T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed
Date: December 10, 2007Complaint - Professional Negligence Filed
Date: 2006-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Order Filed
Date: 2007-10-11T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Motion for Summary Judgment 09/14/2007 09:30 AM D- 520
Date: 2007-07-18T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Granted
Date: 2007-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2007-07-16T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Motion for Summary Judgment 08/22/2007 09:00 AM D- 114
Date: 2007-06-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Velma Sonny-Sonia Filed
Date: 2007-04-09T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Assignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2007-05-21T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2007-09-06T00:00:00Declaration in Opposition / Matthew J. Webb Filed by Velma Sonny-Sonia
Date: 2007-08-31T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 09/06/2007 09:00 AM D- 520
Date: 2007-07-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Velma Sonny-Sonia Filed
Date: 2007-08-23T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for The Michael Blumenfeld Law Corporation, Michael Joel Blumenfeld, Micha
Date: 2007-01-04T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 08/21/2007 09:00 AM D- 114
Date: 2007-06-21T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed for Velma Sonny-Sonia
Date: 2007-08-31T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2006-07-14T00:00:00Rejection Letter Issued on Case Management Statement
Date: 2007-04-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Velma Sonny-Sonia Filed
Date: 2006-11-28T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2007-09-06T00:00:00Order Filed
Date: 2007-10-01T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 04/24/2007 09:00 AM D- 110
Date: 2007-01-11T00:00:00Miscellaneous RE: CMC Statement Filed
Date: 2007-04-27T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed for The Michael Blumenfeld Law Corporation, Michael Joel Blumenfel
Date: 2007-05-16T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2007-05-31T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2007-05-31T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment Filed
Date: 2007-09-07T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed for Velma Sonny-Sonia
Date: 2007-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed
Date: October 18, 2007Declaration Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Judge Winifred Y. Smith Filed for Velma Sonny-Sonia
Date: 2007-07-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.