Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Anna Sonneburg, Billy Stanford, California Sportfishing Protection Alliance, Center For Biological Diversity, Chad Stanford, (total of 27) See All filed a(n) Unlimited Civil (Other Complaint (Non-Tort/Non...) case represented by James R. Wheaton, against California Department Of Fish And Game, Charlton H. Bonham, Donald Koch, Gerald Hobbs, California Department Of Fish & Game, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 06, 2005 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil (Other Complaint (Non-Tort/Non...) |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
This complaint is brought by the Karuk Tribe of California and Leaf Hillman against the California Department of Fish and Game and Ryan Broddrick, the Director of the California Department of Fish and Game. The plaintiffs are seeking declaratory and ...
Declaration in Support Filed
Date: March 10, 2006Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: January 26, 2006Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: February 09, 2006Declaration in Support of Lynne Saxton
Date: March 10, 2006Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: March 09, 2006Application Re: Extension of Time Denied
Date: March 10, 2006Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed
Date: March 10, 2006Opposition Filed
Date: March 09, 2006Proposed Order Stipulation and Order
Date: March 07, 2006Proof of Service to respond to motion for protective order Filed
Date: March 07, 2006Declaration Filed by Gerald Hobbs
Date: March 09, 2006Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time Granted
Date: March 07, 2006Order Correcting Clerical Error and Striking Complaint In Intervention Filed
Date: March 02, 2006Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: March 01, 2006Motion for Protective Order Filed for Plaintiff
Date: March 01, 2006Application Re: Order Shortening Time Granted
Date: March 01, 2006Proof of Service on Motion
Date: March 01, 2006Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: March 01, 2006Declaration pltff's Appendix of Non-CA Authority in support
Date: March 01, 2006Proposed Order Application
Date: March 01, 2006Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Application
Date: February 28, 2006Declaration in Support Application
Date: March 01, 2006Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Application
Date: March 01, 2006Application Re: Extension of Time Filed for Raymond W. Koons, The New 49'ers, Inc
Date: February 28, 2006Proposed Order Application
Date: February 28, 2006Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: February 24, 2006Declaration Application
Date: February 28, 2006Complaint in Intervention Filed
Date: February 27, 2006Proposed Order
Date: February 24, 2006Stipulation Re: Entry of Judgment Denied
Date: February 24, 2006Motion For entry of stipulated judgment Filed by Karuk Tribe of California, Leaf Hillman
Date: February 14, 2006Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: February 24, 2006Objections of Gerald Hobbs Filed
Date: February 24, 2006Motion to Intervene Filed for Defendant
Date: February 24, 2006Complaint in Intervention Filed
Date: February 14, 2006Proof of Personal Service on Complaint - Other As to Filed
Date: February 14, 2006Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: February 09, 2006Motion to Intervene Denied
Date: February 09, 2006Motion to Intervene Granted
Date: February 09, 2006Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: February 09, 2006Proof of Service on Motion
Date: February 03, 2006Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed
Date: February 08, 2006Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed
Date: February 03, 2006Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply Filed
Date: February 07, 2006Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 26, 2006Declaration Fourth
Date: January 26, 2006Declaration in Support of Walter G. Duffy, PHD in Support of Entry of Stipulated Judgment Filed
Date: February 03, 2006Declaration in Support Objections Filed
Date: January 26, 2006Reply Brief in Support of Motion Filed
Date: February 03, 2006Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: January 26, 2006Declaration in Opposition Third
Date: January 26, 2006Declaration in Opposition Second
Date: January 26, 2006Proof of Service on Motion
Date: January 26, 2006Objection To entry of the proposed Stipulated Judgment Filed
Date: January 26, 2006Application Re: Other Exparte Granted in Part
Date: January 26, 2006Appendix
Date: January 26, 2006Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 26, 2006Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Reply Filed
Date: January 26, 2006Application Re: Other Exparte Granted
Date: January 26, 2006Motion to Intervene Filed for Defendant
Date: January 26, 2006Proposed Order Application
Date: January 26, 2006Proof of Service by Mail Ex Parte Application Granted Filed
Date: January 26, 2006Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: January 26, 2006Declaration in Support Application
Date: January 26, 2006Application Re: Other Exparte Filed: order to extend hearin on proposed stipulated judgment
Date: January 26, 2006Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: January 26, 2006Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: January 26, 2006Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Application
Date: January 25, 2006Exhibit Application Proof of Service by Facsimile
Date: January 25, 2006Motion for Pro Hac Vice Granted
Date: January 26, 2006Motion to Intervene - Motion Rescheduled
Date: January 26, 2006Exhibits
Date: January 23, 2006Declaration in Support Filed
Date: January 23, 2006Application Re: Other Exparte Filed:
Date: January 25, 2006Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 23, 2006Proposed Order Application
Date: January 25, 2006Declaration Application of Neysa A. Fligor in Support
Date: January 25, 2006Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Filed
Date: January 23, 2006Declaration in Support Filed
Date: January 20, 2006Proof of Service Reply Memorandum, Declaration , Request for Judicial Notice, Appendix Filed
Date: January 19, 2006Appendix Filed
Date: January 19, 2006Declaration in Support of Walter Duffy Filed
Date: January 20, 2006Appendix of Non-California Authority in Support of Entry o9f Stipulated Judgment Filed
Date: January 20, 2006Brief Filed
Date: January 20, 2006Declaration in Support of Toz Soto Filed
Date: January 20, 2006Proposed Order Stipulation
Date: January 11, 2006Declaration of Leaf Hillman
Date: January 12, 2006Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed
Date: January 13, 2006Declaration of Roger Beers
Date: January 12, 2006Request for Judicial Notice Filed for Third Party
Date: January 19, 2006Stipulation Re: Entry of Judgment Filed for California Department of Fish and Game
Date: January 11, 2006Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Filed
Date: January 12, 2006Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to Intervine Filed
Date: January 19, 2006Exhibit Appendix of Non-Cali Authority
Date: January 10, 2006Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 10, 2006Declaration in Opposition of Neysa A. Fligor
Date: January 10, 2006Proof of Service by Hand
Date: January 10, 2006Declaration Second Declaration of David McCracken
Date: January 10, 2006Declaration Second Declaration of Joseph C. Greene
Date: January 10, 2006Declaration in Opposition of James L. Buchal
Date: January 10, 2006Proof of Service on Motion
Date: January 04, 2006Motion for Pro Hac Vice Filed by The New 49'ers, Inc, Raymond W. Koons
Date: January 04, 2006Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed
Date: January 10, 2006Proof of Service on California State Bar of Pro Hac Vice Papers Filed
Date: January 09, 2006Order Order Extending Schedule Deadlines And Setting An New Hearing Date Filed
Date: October 20, 2005Notice of Order Notice Of Invitation to Mediation, and Order Filed
Date: August 02, 2005Request for Judicial Notice
Date: December 16, 2005Civil Court Trial 02/23/2006 09:00 AM D- 512
Date: October 21, 2005Case Management Conf Continuance 12/20/2005 09:00 AM D- 512
Date: November 23, 2005Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: December 20, 2005Order ORDER AFTER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Filed
Date: December 20, 2005Miscellaneous Stipulation re: Extending Schedule Deadlines Filed
Date: September 23, 2005Miscellaneous Stipulation Extending Schedule Deadlines And Setting A New Hearing Date Filed
Date: October 20, 2005Order Extending Schedule Deadlines And Setting A New Hearing Date Filed
Date: September 23, 2005Motion to Intervene Filed for Third Party
Date: December 16, 2005Letter dated December 12, 2005 from Attorney James L. Buchal Filed
Date: December 15, 2005Proof of Service on Motion
Date: December 16, 2005Proof of Service by Mail RE Stipulation and Order Extending Time and New Hearing Date Filed
Date: September 23, 2005Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: July 22, 2005Motion For case management conference to set hearings on the merits Granted
Date: July 22, 2005Appendix
Date: December 16, 2005Letter from The Court re: CEQA assignment Filed
Date: June 17, 2005Proof of Service on Complaint As to California Department of Fish and Game Filed
Date: June 01, 2005Case Management Statement of Karuk Tribe of California, Leaf Hillman Filed
Date: July 11, 2005Proof of Service on Complaint As to Filed
Date: May 10, 2005Initial Case Management Conference 09/06/2005 09:00 AM D- 520
Date: July 06, 2005Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Karuk Tribe of California
Date: May 06, 2005Notice of of Settlement Meeting Filed
Date: June 30, 2005Complaint - Other Filed
Date: May 06, 2005Summons with Proof of Service As to Ryan Broddrick Filed
Date: June 01, 2005For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.