Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Telegraph Avenue Company, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Bio Online, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 29, 2003 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil (Confession Of Judgment (Non-D...) |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Letter re Dropping OEX from Judg. Creditor Filed
Date: February 01, 2006Civil Order of Examination (Order) Issued
Date: November 08, 2005Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Telegraph Avenue Company, LLC
Date: November 04, 2003Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed
Date: October 05, 2005OEX - Continued
Date: December 21, 2005Writ of Execution - Partially Satisfied from Filed
Date: September 17, 2004Declaration of Service by Mail - Minutes
Date: December 21, 2005Declaration in Support Filed
Date: March 22, 2004Declaration re: Interest Filed
Date: September 14, 2004Proof of Service on oex Filed
Date: December 06, 2005OEX - Dropped - Per Request of Moving Party
Date: February 01, 2006Return on Writ from Filed
Date: August 14, 2006Certificate of Attorney
Date: October 29, 2003Confession of Judgment Filed
Date: October 29, 2003For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.