Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Carmen V Holdridge, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Raymond I Holdridge, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Therese M. Zartman presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 12, 2006 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions3900 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time3898 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
PARTY CARMEN V HOLDRIDGE UPDATED: ADDRESS Not Applicable |
|
September 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
NTC OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTY OF RECORD (IMAGED) Not Applicable |
|
September 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FILED. TUCKERMAN THOMPSON& HOWINGTON WITHDRAWS AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD. CARMEN V HOLDRIDGE IS NOW REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER. Not Applicable |
|
September 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT MAILED 9/4/14 Not Applicable |
|
September 04, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 09/02/14 | |
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON FAMILY LAW FILED 12/31/2003 OF CARMEN HOLDRIDGE FILED Not Applicable |
|
July 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
HEARING RE: MSC/TSC VACATED |
|
May 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
FAMILY LAW MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - Minutes Pre-D Complete JUDGE PRO TEM: THERESE ZARTMAN PRESIDING CLERK: ANGIE HICKAM COURT REPORTER TERESA BORJE 11383 BAILIFF: R BEARDSLEE - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY DANIEL RINADELLI PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. PETITIONER CARMEN V HOLDRIDGE PRESENT RESPONDENT RAYMOND I HOLDRIDGE PRESENT - PROCEEDINGS: WITNESS -- EACH PARTY IS SWORN AND EXAMINED. COUNSEL RECITE AN ORAL STIPULATION INTO THE RECORD AND WAIVE THE COURT CLERK FROM RECORDING SAID STIPULATION. STATUS TAKEN - COURT FINDS: THE COURT FINDS JURISDICTION WAS ACQUIRED BY RAYMOND I HOLDRIDGE ON 04/14/04 BY FILING OF RESPONSE. DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE GRANTED ON GROUNDS OF IRRECONCILABLE DIFFERENCES UPON ENTRY OF THE FINAL DECREE, PETITIONER'S FORMER NAME, MARIA DEL CARMEN MARTINEZ SHALL BE RESTORED TO HER. MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES UPON SIGNING OF JUDGMENT PETITIONER SHALL MAINTAIN CHILDREN ON HER MEDICAL INSURANCE. EACH PARTY SHALL PAY ONE HALF OF ANY UNPAID/UNREIMBURSED MEDICAL EXPENSES. - PETITIONERS COUNSEL SHALL NOTIFY COUNSEL FOR CHILDREN THAT HE SHALL SUBMIT A BILL WITHIN 30 DAYS TO BOTH SIDES. EACH SIDE SHALL PAY ONE HALF OF MINORS COUNSELS ATTORNEY FEES. - HEARINGS: COURT ADVANCES MSC/TSC SET ON 7/3/07 TO TODAY AND VACATES. VACATE HRG HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 07/03/07 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT R17. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === Judge: JUDGE PRO TEM: THERESE ZARTMAN PRESIDING |
|
May 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
FAMILY LAW MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE VACATED |
|
May 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BRIEF FILED BY CARMEN V HOLDRIDGE Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.