Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Sherry, Janett Irene, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Sherry, John Edmond, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Webster, Jason W. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 28, 2016 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage Without Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions301 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time301 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2020 | Hearing | Rejection/Correction Notice | |
July 27, 2020 | Hearing |
Findings and Orders hearing date 5/13/2020 Judge: Pritchard, Kenneth G. |
|
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Findings and Orders hearing date 5/13/2020 Judge: Pritchard, Kenneth G. |
|
July 17, 2020 | Hearing | Rejection/Correction Notice | |
July 09, 2020 | Hearing | Rejection/Correction Notice | |
May 13, 2020 | Hearing |
Request for Order - Petitioner
Judge: Webster, Jason W. |
|
April 28, 2020 | Hearing | Rejection/Correction Notice | |
April 28, 2020 | Hearing |
Ruling
Judge: Webster, Jason W. |
|
March 23, 2020 | Hearing |
Proof of Personal Service 5/13/2020: Proof of Personal Service |
|
March 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Personal Service 5/13/2020: Proof of Personal Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.