Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Potts, Angela, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Potts, Thomas M., in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Glennon, Donald P., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 15, 2016 |
CategoryForeign Support Order |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time693 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2018 | Hearing |
Stipulation and Order re Modification of Child Support
Judge: Webster, Jason W. |
|
February 06, 2018 | Hearing |
Motion - DCSS (Modification)
Judge: Webster, Jason W. |
|
December 21, 2017 | Hearing |
Notice of Motion - Modification (DCSS) Re: MOD, CS/HC/STANDARD ORDERS Hearing Date: 2/6/18 Hearing Time: 9:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:BR |
|
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion - Modification (DCSS) Re: MOD, CS/HC/STANDARD ORDERS Hearing Date: 2/6/18 Hearing Time: 9:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:BR |
|
January 10, 2017 | Hearing |
DCSS: Findings and Order After Hearing
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
October 04, 2016 | Hearing |
Motion - DCSS (Modification)
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
July 19, 2016 | Hearing |
Motion - DCSS (Modification)
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
May 24, 2016 | Hearing |
Notice of Motion - Modification (DCSS) Re: MOD. CS/HC/STANDARD ORDERS/IMPUTE EARNINGS Hearing Date: 7/19/16 Hearing Time: 9:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:BR |
|
May 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion - Modification (DCSS) Re: MOD. CS/HC/STANDARD ORDERS/IMPUTE EARNINGS Hearing Date: 7/19/16 Hearing Time: 9:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:BR |
|
March 15, 2016 | Hearing | Notice Re Payment of Support |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.