Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Crosby, Danielle, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Mcneil, Charles, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Stuart L. Hing presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2014 |
CategoryDv-100 Request For Order, Domestic Violence Prevention |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time16 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2014 |
Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention
Judge: Stuart Hing |
||
February 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention Dropped | |
February 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing Commenced and Completed | |
January 31, 2014 | Docket Event | Confidential EPO expires 1/31/2014 | |
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (DV) Granted and Notice of Hearing Issued | |
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Filed | |
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing 02/14/2014 08:31 AM D- 5 | |
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Amended Domestic Violence Temporary Restraining Order (CLETS) Filed | |
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (Domestic Violence Prevention) Received for Danielle Crosby | |
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.