Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Finney, Misty, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Pinedo, Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Stuart L. Hing presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryDv-100 Request For Order, Domestic Violence Prevention |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time675 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney Filed for Misty Finney | |
January 17, 2014 |
Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention
Judge: Stuart Hing |
||
January 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney Filed for Misty Finney | |
January 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Restraining Order After Hearing Granted | |
January 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing Commenced and Completed | |
January 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration of Diligence Filed | |
January 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention As to Misty Finney Filed | |
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order Filed for Daniel Pinedo | |
January 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Domestic Violence Hearing 01/17/2014 08:30 AM D- 5 | |
January 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on Request for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention As to Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.