Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lawson, Margaret F., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Lawson, James R. Jr., in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 20, 2006 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 04, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions301 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time382 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2007 | Docket Event | Qualified Domestic Relations Order for Support Filed | |
May 04, 2007 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Received | |
February 15, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed | |
February 15, 2007 | Docket Event | Judgment of Dissolution Filed | |
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on Petition for Dissolution of Marriage As to James R. Lawson Jr. Filed | |
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event | Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party James R. Lawson Jr. Filed | |
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event | Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to James R. Lawson Jr. Entered | |
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event | Proposed Judgment Received | |
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event | Declaration Re: Default or Uncontested Judgment Filed for Margaret F. Lawson | |
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event | Rejection Letter Issued on Judgment of Dissolution |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.