Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tran, Tien Nam, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Truong, Lananh Thi, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Cycle Time326 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2006 | Docket Event | Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered | |
November 21, 2006 | Docket Event | Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed | |
September 07, 2006 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration Filed for Petitioner | |
February 27, 2006 | Docket Event | Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Lananh Thi Truong Entered | |
February 27, 2006 | Docket Event | Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Lananh Thi Truong Filed | |
January 11, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed | |
January 11, 2006 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail Filed | |
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event | Summons on Petition Issued and Filed | |
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event | Petition for Dissolution of Marriage Filed | |
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event | Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.