Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Nellie Salazar, Guillermo Salazar, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Susanne Susie Michel Salazar, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Joseph E. Johnston presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 1999 |
CategoryHarassment |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
FEE PAYMENT Not Applicable |
|
January 18, 2000 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: HARASSMENT/TRO FILED BY GUILLERMO SALAZAR, NELLIE SALAZAR. - Minutes Pre-D Complete JOSEPH E JOHNSTON PRESIDING. CLERK: BERTHA M. SALAZAR REPORTER: DENISE BEARD BAILIFF: G DECKER PLAINTIFF GUILLERMO SALAZAR, NELLIE SALAZAR PRESENT DEFENDANT SUSANNE SUSIE MICHEL SALAZAR PRESENT - PROCEEDINGS: DEFENDANT HAS NO OBJECTION TO RESTRAINING ORDER. IT IS ORDERED: DEFENDANT(S) , SHALL NOT HARM, ANNOY OR HARASS PLAINTIFFS. AND SPECIFICALLY IT IS ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT(S); NOT THREATEN, STRIKE, OR MAKE PHYSICAL CONTACT WITH PLAINTIFF(S) NOT KEEP PLAINTIFF(S) UNDER SURVEILLANCE NOT FOLLOW PLAINTIFF(S) NOT TELEPHONE PLAINTIFF(S) NOT BLOCK PLAINTIFF'S MOVEMENTS IN PUBLIC PLACES OR THOROUGHFARES THIS ORDER SHALL BE ENFORCED BY ALL PEACE OFFICERS IN THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA. OTHER ORDERS: DEFENDANT, SUSANNE SUSIE MICHEL SALAZAR, MAY CONTANCT MINORS FATHER BY TELEPHONE AT PLAINTIFFS. THIS ORDER SHALL EXPIRE AT MIDNIGHT ON 01/18/01 THE PREVAILING PARTY/ GUILLERMO SALAZAR, NELLIE SALAZAR SHALL PREPARE THE ORDER AFTER HEARING AND TRANSMIT COPIES OF IT TO THE APPROPRIATE LAW ENFORCEMENT AGENCIES. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL. CASE DISPOSITIONED BY JUDGMENT ACTION - COMPLETE Judge: JOSEPH E JOHNSTON PRESIDING. |
|
January 18, 2000 | Docket Event |
ORDER AFTER HEARING ON PETITION FOR INJUNCTION PROHIBITING HARRASSMENT FILED -- HEARING DATE 01/18/00. Not Applicable |
|
January 07, 2000 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SUSANNE SUSIE MICHEL SALAZAR; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/06/00 Not Applicable |
|
January 03, 2000 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION RE: 4 HOUR NOTICE TO OPPOSING PARTY FILED. Not Applicable |
|
January 03, 2000 | Docket Event |
OSC RE: HARASSMENT/TRO FILED BY GUILLERMO SALAZAR, NELLIE SALAZAR Not Applicable |
|
January 03, 2000 | Docket Event |
HEARING RE: TRO RE HARASSMENT - Minutes Pre-D Complete JOSEPH E JOHNSTON PRESIDING. CLERK: BERTHA M. SALAZAR REPORTER: DENISE BEARD PLAINTIFF GUILLERMO SALAZAR, NELLIE SALAZAR PRESENT DEFENDANT ABSENT. - PROCEEDINGS: EX-PARTE HEARING IS HELD. EX PARTE ORDERS GRANTED - ORDER SIGNED ON THIS DATE. - HEARINGS: OSC RE HARASSMENT SET 01/18/00 @ 08:30 DEPT R20 ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === Judge: JOSEPH E JOHNSTON PRESIDING. |
|
December 30, 1999 | Docket Event |
PETITION FILED (CIVIL) Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.