Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Farmers Insurance Exchange, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Wells, Dustin, against Phillip A Sanangelo, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 1999 |
CategoryInsurance Coverage/Subrogation |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT IN FULL FILED. Not Applicable |
|
March 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT IN FULL FILED. Not Applicable |
|
February 16, 2001 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED RE: PAYMENT OF JUDGMENT IN INSTALLMENTS. Not Applicable |
|
February 15, 2001 | Docket Event |
CASE SENT TO R6 FOR STP & ORDR Not Applicable |
|
February 15, 2001 | Docket Event |
FEE PAYMENT Not Applicable |
|
December 05, 2000 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF FACTS ISSUED Not Applicable |
|
December 05, 2000 | Docket Event |
FEE PAYMENT Not Applicable |
|
August 11, 2000 | Docket Event |
STATUS CONFERENCE VACATED |
|
July 17, 2000 | Docket Event |
ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED Not Applicable |
|
April 19, 2000 | Docket Event |
SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT. Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.