Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Rogers, Robert R., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Rogers, Julie Y., in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Kenneth G. Pritchard presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 16, 2008 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage With Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions120 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2011 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice JUDGMENT - DOES NOT MATCH REQUEST OF PETITION - MUST RESUBMIT |
|
September 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice JUDGMENT - DOES NOT MATCH REQUEST OF PETITION - MUST RESUBMIT |
|
March 02, 2011 | Hearing |
NP1085 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: REVIEW RE: DEFAULT HEARING THE CLERK'S OFFICE WAS CONTACTED BY MR. ROGERS AND HE REPRESENTED HE WOULD BE UNABLE TO APPEAR. CAUSE OFF CALENDAR. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
March 02, 2011 | Hearing |
4004 Default Hearing Entered. |
|
March 02, 2011 | Hearing |
Default
Judge: Pritchard, Kenneth G. |
|
March 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
4004 Default Hearing Entered. |
|
March 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
NP1085 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: REVIEW RE: DEFAULT HEARING THE CLERK'S OFFICE WAS CONTACTED BY MR. ROGERS AND HE REPRESENTED HE WOULD BE UNABLE TO APPEAR. CAUSE OFF CALENDAR. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
February 17, 2011 | Hearing |
Default Setting Card FOR:DEFAULT HEARING HEARING DATE:03/02/2011 HEARING TIME:9:00 AM HEARING DEPT/DIV:BR |
|
February 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Setting Card FOR:DEFAULT HEARING HEARING DATE:03/02/2011 HEARING TIME:9:00 AM HEARING DEPT/DIV:BR |
|
April 15, 2009 | Hearing |
NP1840 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: DEFAULT HEARING THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: ROBERT R. ROGERS (PE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. THE COURT ADMONISHES THE FATHER WITH THE CONCERNS THE COURT HAS WITH THE NUMBER OF CHILDREN AND THIER AGES WITH THE FATHER'S WORK SCHEDULE. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: BASED UPON THE TESTIMONY THE COURT WILL GRANT THE JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION WITH THE COURT MODIFICATIONS AS FOLLOWS: THE MISSOURI AND COLORADO IS DELETED FROM THE TRAVEL WITH CHILDREN; THE PARENT NOTIFYING THE EMBASSY OR CONSULATE IS DELETED; KEEPING A LOG BOOK IS DELETED; THE COURT WILL RESERVE JURISDICTION OVER CHILD SUPPORT AND SPOSUAL SUPPORT IS TERMINATED AS TO BOTH PETITIONER AND RESPONDENT. JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION GRANTED. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. AFTER THE HEARING THE COURT SUSPENDS THE ORDER GRANTING THE DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE BASED UPON THE ORDERS IN COLORADO THAT WERE NOT ADDRESSED. THE CLERK IS TO CONTACT MR. ROGERS TO RESET THE HEARING FOR CLARIFICATION OF THE COLORADO ORDERS. THE CLERK CONTACTED MR. ROGERS AND WAS INFORMED OF RESETTING THE MATTER AND OF THE JUDGMENT BEING SUSPENDED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.