Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Metodio De Toro, Maureen, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Toro Zayas, Victor Luis, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Cory J. Woodward presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2007 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage With Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions418 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time915 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2009 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice NOTICE OF MOTION HAS INCORRECT HEARING TIME |
|
August 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice NOTICE OF MOTION HAS INCORRECT HEARING TIME |
|
January 07, 2009 | Hearing |
180B Pmt: Certified Copy of Paper, Record or Proceeding on Amount of $15.00 for METODIO DE TORO, MAUREEN (PE-1). Received from MAUREEN. Receipt #431658 for amount of $15.00. Detail: 1X$10.00 1X$5.00. |
|
January 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
180B Pmt: Certified Copy of Paper, Record or Proceeding on Amount of $15.00 for METODIO DE TORO, MAUREEN (PE-1). Received from MAUREEN. Receipt #431658 for amount of $15.00. Detail: 1X$10.00 1X$5.00. |
|
September 25, 2008 | Hearing |
Notice Regarding Payment of Support (Out) SUBSTITUTION OF PAYEE CHILD SUPPORT PAYABLE DIRECTLY TO: VICTOR L. TOROZAYAS |
|
September 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice Regarding Payment of Support (Out) SUBSTITUTION OF PAYEE CHILD SUPPORT PAYABLE DIRECTLY TO: VICTOR L. TOROZAYAS |
|
August 25, 2008 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice RETURNED SUB OF PAYEE TO DCSS. THIS IS A RIDGECREST CASE. SEND TO RIDGECREST THEY WIIL PROCESS PAPER WORK. |
|
August 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice RETURNED SUB OF PAYEE TO DCSS. THIS IS A RIDGECREST CASE. SEND TO RIDGECREST THEY WIIL PROCESS PAPER WORK. |
|
May 28, 2008 | Hearing |
NP1040 Department: AR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE, CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, MISC FILED 1/7/08 AND PROOF OF COMPLIANCE FROM RESPONDENT FOR ANGER MANAGEMENT CLASSES. NO APPEARANCE BY EITHER PARTY MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RESTRAINING ORDERS IS DENIED. WITHOUT PREJUDICE THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
May 28, 2008 | Hearing |
4002 Motion New Calendar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.